Clapper v. Clark Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David M. Clapper
Defendant: Clark Development, Inc., Mikar, Ltd., Unizan Bank National Association, Huntington National Bank, United National Bank & Trust Co., All About Children's Learning and Play Center-Cleveland Ave., Inc., Karen Clark, Terrell Quincy, Gloria James, Randi Marion, Tracy Holderbaum, Susan Staples, Kelvin Williams, Amy Preston, John Filipovich, Mike Buser, Brent Moore, Susan Gowins, John Doe, 1, John Doe, 2, John Doe, 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9 and John Doe 10
Case Number: 5:2009cv00569
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: John R. Adams
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Order denying Attorney English's Motion for reconsideration. Related Doc # 599 . The Court will not impose attorney fees. English will solely be subject to the $500 fine imposed by the Court. Having finalized the sanction for English's contempt, the Court intends for this order to serve as a final, appealable order. Judge John R. Adams on 9/13/17.(L,J)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Order denying Defendant Clark Development's Motion for relief (Related Doc # 500 ). Judge John R. Adams on 2/4/16.(L,J)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 Order finding Attorney Brent English in Contempt of Court. English shall pay a fine of $500 and shall pay the reasonable attorney fees incurred as a result of his multiple failures to appear. See order for further details. Judge John R. Adams on 11/17/15. (L,J)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Order denying Respondent Bruno's Motion to strike (Related Doc # 460 ); denying Respondent Bruno's Motion to unseal (Related Doc # 461 ); denying Respondent Bruno's Motion to clarify (Related Doc # 462 ); and denying Respondent Bruno's Motion to vacate (Related Doc # 463 ). Judge John R. Adams on 5/22/14.(K,C)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Order granting the joint motion to show cause (Related Doc # 399 ); The Court finds David Bruno in contempt of court for violating Court Orders. Mr. Bruno is ordered to reimburse the receivership estate in the amount of $111,820 ($ 23,260 receivers fees and $88,560 receivers counsels fees) and Defendant Huntington Bank in the amount of $46,787. The movants request for attorneys fees and costs for prosecuting the motion to show cause is denied. Judge John R. Adams on 4/15/14.(K,C)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Memorandum, opinion, and order granting Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 260 ); granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion for partial summary judgment (Related Doc # 261 ); and granting Defendant Melvin Clark, Sr's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 262 ). Judge John R. Adams on 3/6/12.(K,C)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure. Court enters judgment for the amount due on the $2.4 million Note against CDI. Huntington's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted. (Doc. #[157}. Unless the sums found to be due to Hun tington are fully paid within ten (10) days from the date of the entry of this decree, the equity of redemption of CDI in the Property shall be foreclosed and the Property shall be sold free of the interests of all parties to this action subject to redemption by CDI. Judge John R. Adams on 04/23/10. (K,C)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order awarding Receiver David M. Hunter $26,495.62 and Brouse McDowell is awarded $20,739.00 for legal services with $276.73 awarded for expenses. (Doc. # 114 ) Judge John R. Adams on 2/17/10. (K,C)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Memorandum of Opinion and Order granting Huntington's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 86 ) on the issue of priority; denying plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 88 )on the issue of priority. Judge John R. Adams on 12/28/2009.(H,RM)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order granting Motion for order (Related Doc # 40 ) Discovery due by 8/14/2009. Judge John R. Adams on 7/24/2009.(E,S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clapper v. Clark Development, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Clapper
Represented By: Andrew W. Mychalowych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikar, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unizan Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Bank & Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All About Children's Learning and Play Center-Cleveland Ave., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell Quincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Holderbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Filipovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Buser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Gowins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?