Phillips v. LaRose
Petitioner: Jeffrey Scott Phillips
Respondent: Christopher LaRose
Case Number: 5:2013cv00693
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J. Helmick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Memorandum Opinion and Order: I adopt the Report and Recommendation in full. I deny Grounds 1 and 4 of Phillips' petition for a writ of habeas corpus. I also overrule Phillips' objections, (Doc. No. 60 and Doc. No. 68), to Judge Ru iz's decisions denying Phillips' Rule 60(b) motion, (Doc. No. 57), and denying Phillips' motion to expand the record. (Doc. No. 65). Further, I certify there is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability. 28 U.S.C. § 2253; Fed. R. App. P. 22(b). re 67 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/5/2019. (S,AL)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Memorandum Opinion: The Petitioner's objections are well taken as they pertain to the lack of his trial court transcripts. The remainder of his objections are overruled. I adopt, in part, the Magistrate Judge's May 6, 2016 Report a nd Recommendation. Specifically, I adopt the Magistrate Judge's recommendations on procedural default and cognizable claims. (Doc. No. 30 at pp. 16-24). The Respondent is ordered to secure and serve copies of the trial transcripts on Petition er within 45 days of this Order. The Respondent shall also file those trial transcripts on this docket. This matter will be referred back to Magistrate Judge Ruiz for further proceedings on the remaining claims. re 30 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/20/2017. (S,AL)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum and Order Denying Petitioner's Motion for an order to provide transcripts (Related Doc # 22 ); and Denying Petitioner's Motion for leave to file a reply to the warden's response (Related Doc # 24 ). The petitioner shall filed his Traverse within thirty (30) days of the receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 9/11/15. (M,De)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum and Order that the motion for reconsideration (doc. 18 ) is GRANTED. The respondent shall provide a copy of the trial transcript, as well as any other exhibits attached to the Return of Writ which have not already been provide d, to the petitioner within fourteen (14) days of the receipt of this Order. The motion for extension of time (doc. 19 ) is GRANTED. Phillips shall file his Traverse within forty-five (45) days of the receipt of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 3/6/2015.(M,De)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum and Order that the Petitioner Jeffrey Scott Phillip's Motion for trial transcripts is DENIED. However, during the pendency of this motion, the deadline for Phillips to file his Traverse had passed. Because it was not unr easonable for Phillips to await a ruling on his motion, the court will sua sponte extend the deadline for Phillips to file his Traverse. Phillips shall file his Traverse within thirty (30) days of the receipt of this Order. (Related Doc # 12 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 2/3/2015.(M,De)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Scott Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher LaRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?