Williams v. Ronette Burkes
Petitioner: Agatha Martin Williams
Respondent: Ronette Burkes
Case Number: 5:2014cv01304
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Presiding Judge: Nancy A. Vecchiarelli
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Petitioner's motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 50 ) is granted, but, upon reconsideration, the Court discerns no reason to depart from its original decision rendered on May 18, 2016, including its decision to deny a certificate of appealability, and petitioner's motion for a certificate of appealability is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/10/2016. (P,J)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The objections are overruled and the R&R is accepted. (Doc. No. 39 .) The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied and this case is dismissed. The Court also certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith and that there is no basis upon which to issue a certificate of appealability. 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(a)(3), 2253(c); Fed. R. App. P. 22(b). Further, petitioner's motion for bond (Doc. No. 47 ) is denied, as is the motion to intervene filed by six non-party movants (Doc. No. 34 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 5/18/2016. (P,J)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order: Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file objections (Doc. No. 41 ) is denied as moot, since the objections have already been filed. (See Doc. No. 42 .) Petitioner's motion to correct the case caption on the R&R (Do c. No. 43 ) is noted, but denied because the Court will utilize the correct caption when ruling on the objections to the R&R. The Court has examined the R&R's recommendation to deny the motion to intervene (Doc. No. 34 ) because it fails to e stablish any conditional or unconditional right to intervene under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. The Court accepts the recommendation, finding it to be correct. Therefore, the motion to intervene is denied. (Related Doc # 39 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/21/2016. (P,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ronette Burkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Agatha Martin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronette Burkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?