Queen v. Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Walter J. Queen, William Benigni, Larry W Faust, Jr., Thomas Hanna and Ronald Stidham
Defendant: Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv02262
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The motion for summary judgment of defendant Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc., d/b/a TenPoint Crossbow Technologies, is granted. (Related Doc. No. 50 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 12/31/2018. (P,J)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The amended motion to alter or amend judgment filed by plaintiff Larry W. Faust, Jr. (Doc. No. 22 ) is denied. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/24/2017. (P,J)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court grants defendant's motion to dismiss all plaintiffs but the original plaintiff, without prejudice. That said, the FAC will continue to control as to plaintiff Queen, although the remaining plaintif fs and allegations pertaining to them are all dismissed. To the extent defendant's motion seeks dismissal of Queen's complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, it is denied. (Related Doc. No. 10 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 4/14/2017. (P,J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter J. Queen
Represented By: Michael J. Elliott
Represented By: Lawrence J. Scanlon
Represented By: Don A. Tittle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Benigni
Represented By: Michael J. Elliott
Represented By: Lawrence J. Scanlon
Represented By: Don A. Tittle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W Faust, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Elliott
Represented By: Lawrence J. Scanlon
Represented By: Don A. Tittle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hanna
Represented By: Michael J. Elliott
Represented By: Lawrence J. Scanlon
Represented By: Don A. Tittle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Stidham
Represented By: Michael J. Elliott
Represented By: Lawrence J. Scanlon
Represented By: Don A. Tittle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter's Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Martha L. Allee
Represented By: Carolyn M. Cappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?