Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Huntington National Bank et al
Appellant: Schwab Industries, Inc.
Appellee: Lawrence E. Oscar and Huntington National Bank
Case Number: 5:2017cv01255
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Filing 5 Marginal Order approving #4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Appeal. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/29/2017. (JLG)
June 29, 2017 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Appeal filed by Schwab Industries, Inc.. (Longo, Charles)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order In conformity with the Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Appellant Schwab Ind., Inc. shall serve and file its brief (not to exceed 20 pages) within 30 days after the docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically. Appellees Hahn, Loeser & Parks, LLP, Lawrence E. Oscar, and Andrew Krause shall serve and file their brief (not to exceed 20 pages) within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief (not to exceed 10 pages) within 14 days after service of Appellees' brief. Oral argument on appeals shall not be heard unless written application is made and the Court determines that oral argument would be beneficial in resolving the issues. All briefs must be served on adverse parties. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/23/2017. (JLG)
June 15, 2017 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Russ Kendig, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 14-6024, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (M,TL)
June 15, 2017 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
June 15, 2017 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
June 15, 2017 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated 05/30/2017 filed by Schwab Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order, #2 Bankruptcy Memorandum Opinion & Order, #3 Bankruptcy Transmission Form, #4 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (M,TL)
June 15, 2017 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL)
June 15, 2017 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. Recused pursuant to General Order No. 2009-3. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Huntington National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Schwab Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Charles V. Longo
Represented By: Matthew D. Greenwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lawrence E. Oscar
Represented By: Michael A. VanNiel
Represented By: Thomas D. Warren
Represented By: Jack B. Cooper
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Represented By: Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Andrew S. Nicoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?