Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. v. FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation et al

Appellee: FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation and First Energy Generation LLC
Appellant: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01875
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #19 appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file opening briefs; all briefing is stayed; opening briefs, if required, are due 30 days after the date upon which the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the direct certification petition. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/4/2018. (D,S)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 Motion for Expedited Consideration of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief filed by Appellant Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. Related document(s) #19 . (McCollough, Aaron) Modified on 10/4/2018 to term motion in view of order (D,S).
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file opening brief until 30 days after Sixth Circuit ruling on petition for permission for direct appeal filed by Appellant Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief)(McCollough, Aaron)
September 12, 2018 Large binder containing Joint Exhibits from Bankruptcy Court on file in Akron Clerk's Office. (M,TL)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 06/26/2018 before Judge Alan M. Koschik. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/09/2018, #2 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/17/2018, #3 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/31/2018, #4 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 08/28/2018) (M,TL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. Related document #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (M,TL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Notice) (M,TL).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David M. Zensky for Appellees FirstEnergy Solutions Corp. and FirstEnergy Generation, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #16 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/10/2018.(P,J)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 Motion for attorney David M. Zensky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8896073, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zensky Affidavit)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John H. Thompson for Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #15 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/30/2018.(P,J)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Aaron G. McCollough for Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #14 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/30/2018.(P,J)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for attorney John H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8880883, filed by Appellant Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John H. Thompson)(Moore, Branden)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for attorney Aaron G. McCollough to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8880855, filed by Appellant Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Aaron G. McCollough)(Moore, Branden)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Branden P. Moore filed by on behalf of Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Moore, Branden)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brian T. Carney for First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/22/2018.(P,J)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Pratik A. Shah for First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/22/2018.(P,J)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motions by attorneys Brad Kahn, David Applebaum, Ira Dizengoff, Kate Doorley, Lisa G. Beckerman, Scott Alberino, and Todd Brecher to withdraw as counsel for appellees First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Related Doc. Nos. #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/21/2018.(P,J)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Brian T. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8866250, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian T. Carney)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Pratik A. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8865765, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Pratik Shah)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 Motion by Todd Brecher to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 Motion by Scott Alberino to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Motion by Lisa Beckerman to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Motion by Kate Doorley to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 Motion by Ira Dizengoff to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Motion by David Applebaum to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Motion by Brad Kahn to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/15/2018. (P,J)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Todd Brecher. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Scott Alberino. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Lisa G. Beckerman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Kate Doorley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Ira Dizengoff. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney David Applebaum. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Brad Kahn. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney John H Thompson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Notice to Attorney Aaron G. McCollough. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 15, 2018 Remark: This case may be related to case numbers: #5:18cv1854-SL, #5:18cv1251-SL, #5:18cv1244-SL and 5:18cv1259-SL (Related document #1 ) (O,K)
August 15, 2018 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Alan M. Koschik, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 18-50757, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (O,K)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/15/2018. (O,K)
August 15, 2018 Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (O,K)
August 15, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated 8/9/2018 with exhibit A. Filed by Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 8/9/2018 Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Transmission Form, #4 USBC Order, #5 USCB Docket Sheet) (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc. v. FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Ira Dizengoff
Represented By: Brad Kahn
Represented By: Marc B. Merklin
Represented By: John C. Fairweather
Represented By: Brian T. Carney
Represented By: Todd Brecher
Represented By: Kate Doorley
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Represented By: Kate M. Bradley
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Represented By: Scott Alberino
Represented By: David Applebaum
Represented By: Lisa G. Beckerman
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First Energy Generation LLC
Represented By: Ira Dizengoff
Represented By: Brad Kahn
Represented By: Marc B. Merklin
Represented By: John C. Fairweather
Represented By: Brian T. Carney
Represented By: Todd Brecher
Represented By: Kate Doorley
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Represented By: Kate M. Bradley
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Represented By: Scott Alberino
Represented By: David Applebaum
Represented By: Lisa G. Beckerman
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron G. McCollough
Represented By: John H Thompson
Represented By: Branden P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?