Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel et al v. FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation et al
Appellant: Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel, Ohio Valley Electric Corporation and Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Appellee: First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv01956
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #16 Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file opening briefs; all briefing is stayed; opening briefs, if required, are due 30 days after the date upon which the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the direct certification petition. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/11/2018. (D,S)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Determination by Sixth Circuit of Whether to Hear Direct Appeal and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Appellant Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Form of Proposed Order)(Beck, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Transcript of U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 06/26/2018 before Judge Alan M. Koschik. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/09/2018, #2 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/17/2018, #3 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 07/31/2018, #4 Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing held 08/28/2018) (M,TL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. Related document #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (M,TL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Notice) (M,TL).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David M. Zensky for Appellees FirstEnergy Solutions Corp. and FirstEnergy Generation, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/10/2018.(P,J)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 Motion for attorney David M. Zensky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8896049, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zensky Affidavit)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Pratik A. Shah for First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/6/2018.(P,J)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Pratik A. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8891960, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Pratik A. Shah)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brian T. Carney for FirstEnergy Solutions Corp. and FirstEnergy Generation, LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/5/2018.(P,J)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Brian T. Carney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8889072, filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support)(DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motions to withdraw as counsel for First Energy Generation LLC and FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. Attorneys Todd Brecher, Scott Alberino, Lisa G. Beckerman, Kate Doorley, Ira Dizengoff, David Applebaum, and Brad Kahn removed from case. (Related Doc. Nos. #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/30/2018.(P,J)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 Motion by Brad Kahn to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 Motion by David Applebaum to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Motion by Ira Dizengoff to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 Motion by Kate Doorley to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 Motion by Lisa Beckerman to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 Motion by Scott Alberino to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Motion by Todd Brecher to withdraw as attorney filed by First Energy Generation LLC, FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation. (DelGrosso, Lisa)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Brian T. Carney. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney David M. Zensky. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Todd Brecher. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Scott Alberino. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Lisa G. Beckerman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Kate Doorley. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Ira Dizengoff. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney David Applebaum. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Brad Kahn. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney John H Thompson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 28, 2018 Notice to Attorney Aaron G. McCollough. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/27/2018. (P,J) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/27/2018) (P,J).
August 27, 2018 Notice [non-document] to the parties that an appeal from the order of U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Alan M. Koschik, U.S. Bankruptcy Case No. 18-50757, has been filed with the U.S. District Court. All further correspondence and filings relating to the appeal should bear the civil action number of the U.S. District Court. (O,K)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/27/2018. (O,K)
August 27, 2018 Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (O,K)
August 27, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order dated 8/9/2018. This case may be related to case numbers: 5:18cv1875-SL, #5:18cv1854-SL, #5:18cv1251-SL, #5:18cv1244-SL and 5:18cv1259-SL Filed by Ohio Valley Electric Corporation, Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel, Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmission Form, #2 USBC Order, #3 USBC Docket Sheet) (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel et al v. FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel
Represented By: Candice L. Kline
Represented By: David A. Beck
Represented By: Michael N. Beekhuizen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ohio Valley Electric Corporation
Represented By: Mark E. McKane
Represented By: Subash Iyer
Represented By: Michael P. Esser
Represented By: Matthew C. Fagen
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Marc Kieselstein
Represented By: David R. Seligman
Represented By: Richard A. Baumgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron G. McCollough
Represented By: John H Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First Energy Generation LLC
Represented By: Marc B. Merklin
Represented By: Scott Alberino
Represented By: David Applebaum
Represented By: John C. Fairweather
Represented By: Todd Brecher
Represented By: Kate Doorley
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Represented By: Brad Kahn
Represented By: Ira Dizengoff
Represented By: Brian T. Carney
Represented By: Kate M. Bradley
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Represented By: Lisa G. Beckerman
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FirstEnergy Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Marc B. Merklin
Represented By: Scott Alberino
Represented By: David Applebaum
Represented By: John C. Fairweather
Represented By: Todd Brecher
Represented By: Kate Doorley
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Represented By: Brad Kahn
Represented By: Ira Dizengoff
Represented By: Brian T. Carney
Represented By: Kate M. Bradley
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Represented By: Lisa G. Beckerman
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?