Robbins v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Howard S. Robbins
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II, Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security and Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 5:2018cv02130
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security, Department of Health and Human Services c/o U.S. Attorney General on 10/10/2018 and U.S. Attorney on 10/5/2018 filed on behalf of Howard S. Robbins. (Related document #4 ). (O,K)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services on 10/2/2018 filed on behalf of Howard S. Robbins. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Nancy Berryhill Acting Commissioner of Social Security on 9/28/2018; no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Howard S. Robbins. Related document(s) #2 . (T,Je)
October 2, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Commissioner of Social Security, Department of Health and Human Services c/o U.S. Attorney General (7015 0640 0002 6674 2297) and U.S. Attorney (7015 0640 0002 6674 2303). Placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Original Summons issued for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, Department of Health and Human Services c/o U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney. (M,TL)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Howard S. Robbins. Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(O'Brien, Ann Marie)
September 25, 2018 Remark by Clerk re Service Upon U.S. Government Defendant. If a U.S. Government agency or officer is sued, you must provide summons for that defendant, for the U.S. Attorney General (Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. 20530) and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio (801 West Superior Avenue, Suite 400, Cleveland, OH 44113-1852). (M,TL)
September 20, 2018 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Nancy Berryhill Acting Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # 7015 1730 0001 7192 2790), Alex M. Azar Department of Health and Human Services (Receipt # 7015 1730 0001 7192 2783) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (T,Je)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Alex M Azar, II, Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
September 17, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
September 17, 2018 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Mandamus and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee $400.00 paid, receipt #0647-8910730, filed by Howard S. Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, Ann Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard S. Robbins
Represented By: Ann Marie O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?