IAL Logistics India Limited, et al. v. William Sheppee (USA) Ltd.

Plaintiff: IAL Logistics India Limited and IAL Container Line (USA) Inc
Defendant: William Sheppe (USA) Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02864
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Michael R. Fisher for William Sheppe (USA) Ltd. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/1/2019.(P,J)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Michael R. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 54660006907, filed by Defendant William Sheppe (USA) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(O,K)
January 23, 2019 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $230.00 refunded on 01/23/2019 for receipt #0647-9080924. (K,Ve)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Patrick F. Lennon for plaintiffs. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 1/15/2019.(P,J)
January 14, 2019 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: filed in wrong case, 19mc7002. Receipt #: 0647-9080924, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Breen, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR Attorney to use correct event for refund request. Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically filed by IAL Container Line (USA) Inc, IAL Logistics India Limited. (Breen, John) Modified as error on 1/14/2019 (P,WL).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Patrick F. Lennon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. with affidavit, certificate of good standing and proposed order. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9082634, filed by IAL Container Line (USA) Inc, IAL Logistics India Limited. (Breen, John)
January 1, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs . William Sheppe (USA) Ltd. waiver sent on 12/26/2018, answer due 2/25/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Breen, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon William Sheppe (USA) Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,HR)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent IAL Holdings (Middle East) Ltd. for IAL Container Line (USA) Inc. and IAL Logistics India Limited filed by IAL Container Line (USA) Inc. and IAL Logistics India Limited. (S,HR)
December 13, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,HR)
December 13, 2018 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,HR)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against William Sheppee (USA) Ltd. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9051676. Filed by IAL Logistics India Limited and IAL Container Line (USA) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Summons, #5 Waiver of summons) (Breen, John) Modified filers on 12/13/2018 (S,HR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IAL Logistics India Limited, et al. v. William Sheppee (USA) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAL Logistics India Limited
Represented By: John E. Breen
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAL Container Line (USA) Inc
Represented By: John E. Breen
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sheppe (USA) Ltd.
Represented By: Michael R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?