Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., L.P.A. v. InSite Real Estate, LLC

Plaintiff: Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., L.P.A.
Defendant: InSite Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00047
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgement of receipt of original record returned to Stark County Court and received on 2/8/2019. Related document(s) #8 . (M,S)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018cv02321. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Common Pleas Court) (O,K)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Jury Demand filed by InSite Real Estate, LLC. (Shelton, Kyle)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by InSite Real Estate, LLC. (Shelton, Kyle)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Melvin L. Lute, Jr filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lute, Melvin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Kyle A. Shelton , Irving B. Sugarman and Louise M. Mazur filed on behalf of InSite Real Estate, LLC. (Shelton, Kyle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by InSite Real Estate, LLC. (Shelton, Kyle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CV02321 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9084391. Filed by InSite Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelton, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., L.P.A. v. InSite Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty Co., L.P.A.
Represented By: Ralph F. Dublikar
Represented By: Melvin L. Lute, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InSite Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Shelton
Represented By: Irving B. Sugerman
Represented By: Louise M. Mazur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?