Armatas v. Aultman Health Foundation, et al.
Plaintiff: Steven A. Armatas
Defendant: Aultman Hospital, Nihad M. Boutras, Aultman Insurance Company, Pulmonary Physicians, Inc. of Canton, Ohio, Matthew F. Knoch, Gregory Haban, Jeffrey B. Miller, Timothy Regula, Ohio Physicians Professional Corporation, Chadi E. Bouserhal, Mark N. Rose, Aultman Health Foundation, M. Richard Stjernholm, Eyad Nashawati and AultCare Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00349
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 Jury Demand filed by Steven A. Armatas. (Armatas, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Gregory Haban waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Mark N. Rose waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Aultman Hospital waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Aultman Health Foundation waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. AultCare Insurance Company waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Timothy Regula waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Ohio Physicians Professional Corporation waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. M. Richard Stjernholm waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Brian T. Gannon filed by Pulmonary Physicians, Inc. of Canton, Ohio, Eyad Nashawati, M.D., Nihad Boutros, M.D., Jeffrey B. Miller, M.D., Chadi E. Bouserhal, M.D., and Matthew F. Knoch, M.D. (Gannon, Brian) Modified filers on 3/18/2019 (M,TL).
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Pulmonary Physicians, Inc. of Canton, Ohio waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Eyad Nashawati waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Jeffrey B. Miller waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Matthew F. Knoch waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Nihad M. Boutras waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Steven A. Armatas. Chadi E. Bouserhal waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed on behalf of Steven A. Armatas (Armatas, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Richard S. Milligan filed on behalf of Ohio Physicians Professional Corporation, M. Richard Stjernholm. (Milligan, Richard)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Anthony E. Brown filed on behalf of Gregory Haban, Timothy Regula, Mark N. Rose. (Brown, Anthony)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Paul J. Pusateri and Thomas R. Himmelspach filed by AultCare Insurance Company, Aultman Health Foundation, Aultman Hospital. (Himmelspach, Thomas - s/Paul J. Pusateri)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Paul J. Pusateri and Thomas R. Himmelspach filed by AultCare Insurance Company, Aultman Health Foundation, Aultman Hospital. (Pusateri, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(P,J)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provide or issued. (S,HR)
February 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (S,HR)
February 15, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,HR)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Aultman Health Foundation, Aultman Hospital, Aultman Insurance Company, Chadi E. Bouserhal, Nihad M. Boutras, Gregory Haban, Matthew F. Knoch, Jeffrey B. Miller, Eyad Nashawati, Ohio Physicians Professional Corporation, Pulmonary Physicians, Inc. of Canton, Ohio, Timothy Regula, Mark N. Rose, and M. Richard Stjernholm. Filing fee paid, $400.00. Receipt # 54660006931. Filed by Steven A. Armatas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Notice of Dismissal from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Erik Zoumberakis, M.D.) (S,HR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armatas v. Aultman Health Foundation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aultman Hospital
Represented By: Paul J. Pusateri
Represented By: Thomas R. Himmelspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nihad M. Boutras
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aultman Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulmonary Physicians, Inc. of Canton, Ohio
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew F. Knoch
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Haban
Represented By: Anthony E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Miller
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Regula
Represented By: Anthony E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Physicians Professional Corporation
Represented By: Richard S. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadi E. Bouserhal
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N. Rose
Represented By: Anthony E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aultman Health Foundation
Represented By: Paul J. Pusateri
Represented By: Thomas R. Himmelspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Richard Stjernholm
Represented By: Richard S. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyad Nashawati
Represented By: Brian T. Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AultCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul J. Pusateri
Represented By: Thomas R. Himmelspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Armatas
Represented By: Steven A. Armatas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?