State et al. v. Facebook Payments Inc.

Plaintiff: Toledo City School District, Logan Hocking Local School District, Northern Local School District, Woodridge Local Schools, Springfield City School District, Cuyahoga Falls City School District, Lake Local School District, State and City of Dayton Public Schools
Defendant: Facebook Payments Inc. and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01046
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition to #11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by City of Dayton Public Schools, Cuyahoga Falls City School District, Lake Local School District, Logan Hocking Local School District, Northern Local School District, Springfield City School District, Toledo City School District, Woodridge Local Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney General's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notification of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Notification of Filing, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Kramer, Ellen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by City of Dayton Public Schools, Cuyahoga Falls City School District, Lake Local School District, Logan Hocking Local School District, Northern Local School District, Springfield City School District, Toledo City School District, Woodridge Local Schools. (Kramer, Ellen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Order Granting State Assignment, #2 Exhibit B. - Schools' Motion for Assignment, #3 Exhibit C. - Order Denying Motion for Assignment, #4 Exhibit D. - Order Denying Motion to Intervene, #5 Exhibit E. - Order Appointing Inerim Master for ECOT)(Bollin, Kip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs' #8 stipulation of dismissal of Defendant Facebook Payments, Inc. without prejudice. Judge John R. Adams on 6/5/19. (K,C)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Bollin, Kip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by Facebook Payments Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Bollin, Kip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 06/13/2019 to answer First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Facebook Payments Inc.. Related document(s) #5 . (Bollin, Kip)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lake Local School District, Woodridge Local Schools, City of Dayton Public Schools, Logan Hocking Local School District, Toledo City School District, Cuyahoga Falls City School District, Northern Local School District, Springfield City School District. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 filed on behalf of Lake Local School District; Woodridge Local Schools; City of Dayton Public Schools; Logan Hocking Local School District; Toledo City School District; Cuyahoga Falls City School District; Northern Local School District; Springfield City School District (Kramer, Ellen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 First Amended complaint for Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers under O.R.C. 1336.04(A)(2) and 1336.05(A) against Facebook Payments Inc. and adding new party defendant(s) Facebook, Inc., with Jury Demand, Filed by Woodridge Local Schools, Lake Local School District, Logan Hocking Local School District, City of Dayton Public Schools, Toledo City School District, Cuyahoga Falls City School District, Northern Local School District, Springfield City School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Board of Education Decision for 2015-16 School Year, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Board of Education Decision for 2016-17 School Year) (Kramer, Ellen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 06/13/2019 to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Facebook Payments Inc. (Bollin, Kip)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
May 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
May 9, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Facebook Payments Inc. filed by Facebook Payments Inc.. (Bollin, Kip)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-2019-04-1369 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9301797.. Filed by Facebook Payments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bollin, Kip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State et al. v. Facebook Payments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toledo City School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Hocking Local School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Local School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodridge Local Schools
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springfield City School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuyahoga Falls City School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Local School District
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dayton Public Schools
Represented By: Joshua R. Cohen
Represented By: Ellen M. Kramer
Represented By: James B. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments Inc.
Represented By: Marilyn K. Eble
Represented By: James J. Henderson
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Marilyn K. Eble
Represented By: James J. Henderson
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?