Hutchison v. Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Roger Hutchison
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C., John Does and Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01109
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Corporation for Chesapeake Exploration, L.L.C.; identifying Other Affiliates Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C., Chesapeake E&P Holding, L.L.C. and Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C. for Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. filed by Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. (Keller, Clay) Modified to add Other Affiliates on 5/28/2019 (M,TL).
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chesapeake Energy Corporation. (Keller, Clay)
May 20, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Chesapeake Energy Corporation failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. (Keller, Clay)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. Related document(s) #1 . (Keller, Clay)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Tuscarawas County Common Pleas Court, case number 2019CT030196 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9313528.. Filed by Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C.. (Keller, Clay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchison v. Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hutchison
Represented By: Abby L. Botnick
Represented By: Andrew J. Thompson
Represented By: Neal E. Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Exploration L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Represented By: Clay K. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Andrew N. Schock
Represented By: Clay K. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?