Francis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Antonio Francis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv01510
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel on 8/12/2019 for service upon, Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (S,S)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/12/2019. (S,S)
August 6, 2019 Filing Fee in the amount of $400.00 received from Antonio Francis. Receipt # 14660116329 (B,R)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Report & Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is hereby adopted. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $400 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/23/2019. (JLG)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report and Recommendation. It is recommended that Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP be DENIED. It is further recommended that, if this Report & Recommendation is adopted, Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $400 filing fee within fourteen (14) days of the date of any such Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/8/2019. (S,S)
July 2, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/2/2019. (B,R)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
July 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
July 2, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Antonio Francis. (Wilson, Rachel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Antonio Francis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst US Attorney, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst. US Attorney) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Francis
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?