Schmid, et al. v. Bui, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Schmid and Terri A. Schmid
Defendant: SJ Transportation Co., Inc. and Anthony Bui
Case Number: 5:2019cv01663
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Discovery Plan - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures filed by Anthony Bui, SJ Transportation Co., Inc.. (Jamison, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order In accordance with Rule 26(f) and LR 16.3(b)(3), the parties have submitted a discovery plan (ECF No. #8 ). That plan, however, does not adhere to the template provided by the Court in its Case Management Conference Scheduling Order (ECF No. #7 -3) and, as a result, it lacks certain necessary information. No later than 5 days before the Case Management Conference, the parties are directed to resubmit their discovery plan in accordance with the template provided by the Court at ECF No. #7 -3. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/14/2019. (JLG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting of All Parties - filed by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 9/25/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (S,Ke)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation to Waive Service of a Summons filed by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Anthony Bui, SJ Transportation Co., Inc. (Jamison, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J. King, Jr. for Plaintiffs Ronald W. Schmid and Terri A. Schmid. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Document(s) #2 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/25/2019. (JLG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
July 22, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for attorney Robert J. King, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee paid, $ 120, receipt number 14660115434. Filed by Ronald W. Schmid, Terri A. Schmid. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. King, Jr.)(Y,A)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Anthony Bui and SJ Transportation Co., Inc. Filing fee paid, $400. Receipt # 14660115967. Filed by Ronald W. Schmid, Terri A. Schmid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmid, et al. v. Bui, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Schmid
Represented By: Robert J. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri A. Schmid
Represented By: Robert J. King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bui
Represented By: Andrew D. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?