Johnson v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson and Michael Emery
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01669
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hino Motors, Ltd., Other Affiliate Misawa Homes Co., Ltd. for Toyota Motor Corporation filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' responsive pleadings due 9/11/19. Judge John R. Adams on 8/26/19.(L,J)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 11, 2019 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Bricker, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David T. Bright for Michael Emery and Donald Johnson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge John R. Adams on 8/22/19.(K,C)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Motion with Certificate of Good Standing for attorney David T. Bright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9481400, filed by Michael Emery, Donald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Phillips, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. on 8/8/2019; Toyota Motor North America, Inc. on 8/5/2019; and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. on 8/5/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (O,K)
August 2, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0062), Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0093); Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0147), placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
July 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 23, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9430170. Filed by Donald Johnson, Michael Emery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing Summons, #3 Summons Toyota Motor North America, #4 Summons Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A.) (Phillips, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas E. Phillips
Represented By: David T. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Emery
Represented By: Nicholas E. Phillips
Represented By: David T. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: Timothy R. Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R. Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R. Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R. Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?