Advanced Dermatology v. Fieldwork, Inc.
Plaintiff: Advanced Dermatology
Defendant: Fieldwork, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01828
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, To Stay Pursuant to the Primary Jurisdiction Doctrine filed by Defendant Fieldwork, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Order List)(Brunton, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fieldwork, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State Record, #2 Exhibit Class Action Complaint)(Brunton, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, or, in the alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations filed by Defendant Fieldwork, Inc.. (Brunton, Gregory)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Joseph Kendall Merical filed by on behalf of Fieldwork, Inc.. (Merical, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Emily C. Kesler and Jordan P. Vick withdrawn from case. (Related Doc #6 ); Attorney Gregory D. Brunton added as counsel for Defendant Fieldwork, Inc. (Related Doc #6 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/7/19.(K,C)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion by Jordan P. Vick to withdraw as attorney , Unopposed Motion to substitute attorneyGregory D. Brunton in place of attorney Jordan P. Vick filed by Defendant Fieldwork, Inc.. (Vick, Jordan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Jordan P. Vick filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Vick, Jordan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Emily C. Kesler filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Kesler, Emily)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Advanced Dermatology. Fieldwork, Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 filed on behalf of Advanced Dermatology (Frederick, Ronald)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Fieldwork, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Fieldwork, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9465372. Filed by Advanced Dermatology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - offending fax, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Frederick, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Dermatology v. Fieldwork, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Dermatology
Represented By: Ronald I. Frederick
Represented By: Michael L. Fine
Represented By: Michael L. Berler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwork, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D. Brunton
Represented By: Joseph Kendall Merical
Represented By: Jordan P. Vick
Represented By: Emily C. Kesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?