Covel et al v. PNC Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Samar Covel and Jason Covel
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, PNC Bank N.A., John Doe, Cory Williams, National Link, L.P. and U.S. Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 5:2019cv02030
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Opposition to #5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by PNC Bank N.A., Cory Williams. (Schisler, H.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Jason Covel, Samar Covel. (Buchanan, Wesley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 09/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
September 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
September 4, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. and PNC Bancorp., Inc. for PNC Bank N.A. filed by PNC Bank N.A. (Schisler, H.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-2019-03-0831 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9504148.. Filed by PNC Bank N.A., Cory Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1--State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2--State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B--Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schisler, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covel et al v. PNC Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank N.A.
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Williams
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Link, L.P.
Represented By: Amelia A. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samar Covel
Represented By: Wesley C. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Covel
Represented By: Wesley C. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?