Jones v. Shoop
Petitioner: Phillip L. Jones
Respondent: Warden Tim Shoop
Case Number: 5:2019cv02063
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Order. The Court determines for scheduling purposes only that the AEDPA limitations period for Petitioner's habeas corpus petition will expire on October 1, 2020. It remains at all times Petitioner's obligation to produce his own estimate of when the statute of limitations expires and submit his petition according to that estimation. Petitioner may not rely on the Court's computation of time in the event Petitioner submits an untimely petition. The Court reserves Respondent's right to assert a statute-of-limitations defense to any or all claims raised in the petition. The within briefing schedule shall apply. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/24/2019. (R,Sh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Petitioner's Filing of Timeline filed by Phillip L. Jones. (Wilhelm, Joseph)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Filing of Timeline filed by Tim Shoop. Related document(s) #7 .(Leikala, Brenda)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order. To determine the statute of limitations expiration date in this matter, counsel must submit the attached Time Line. Although this Court will make its own determination of the limitations expiration date, it remains at all times the responsibility of counsel for petitioner to make his own estimation as to when the statute of limitations period will expire, and filea timely habeas petition accordingly. Counsel must submit this Time Line as soon as possible but no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/7/2019. (R,Sh)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ) and Motion for appointment of counsel, (Related Doc #3 ), of Assistant Federal Public Defender Joseph Wilhelm. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/7/2019.(R,Sh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Brenda S. Leikala filed by on behalf of Tim Shoop. (Leikala, Brenda)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Filing Civil Cover Sheet filed by Phillip Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilhelm, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion with Memorandum for appointment of counsel filed by Petitioner Phillip Jones. (Wilhelm, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Phillip Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certified Account Statement, #2 Affidavit Prisoner)(Wilhelm, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Intent to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus .. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Phillip Jones. (Wilhelm, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Shoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip L. Jones
Represented By: Joseph E. Wilhelm
Represented By: John P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Tim Shoop
Represented By: Brenda S. Leikala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?