Wingrove v. Wyoming Casing Service Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry W. Wingrove
Defendant: Rene Lopez and Wyoming Casing Service Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02148
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wyoming Casing Service Inc.. (Philipp, Jonathan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Rene Lopez, Wyoming Casing Service Inc.. (Philipp, Jonathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon Rene Lopez on 9/24/2019, filed on behalf of Terry W. Wingrove (Lebovitz, Jordan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Federal Express executed upon Wyoming Casing Service Inc. on 9/20/2019, filed on behalf of Terry W. Wingrove (Lebovitz, Jordan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Rene Lopez, Wyoming Casing Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
September 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
September 18, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Rene Lopez, Wyoming Casing Service Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9527692, filed by Terry W. Wingrove. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Lopez, #3 Summons Wyoming Casing Service) (Lebovitz, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingrove v. Wyoming Casing Service Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry W. Wingrove
Represented By: Jordan D. Lebovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Casing Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?