Lichtenwalter v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter
Defendant: Orvis L. Campbell, Jay Burrier and Food Service Director
Case Number: 5:2019cv02492
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Returned Mail addressed to Party Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. No Longer at Tuscarawas County Jail. Bureau of Prisons Inmate Locator has no further information. Related document(s) #5 . (M,TL)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss case filed by Plaintiff Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. Related document(s) #1 . (M,TL)
December 9, 2019 Copy of #5 Order mailed to Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter at Tuscarawas County Jail, 2295 Reiser Ave. S.E., New Philadelphia, Ohio 44663. (S,HR)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order. Plaintiff has not filed a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is hereby ordered to pay the full filing fee, $400, to proceed with this case if funds to pay it exist in his prisoner account. If the plaintiff does not have funds in his account to pay the entire fee at once, he is ordered to complete and submit the accompanying Financial Application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. The plaintiff's failure either to pay the filing fee, or complete and submit a proper application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Financial Application and Request for Account Statement)(S,HR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Court regarding treatment filed by Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (M,TL)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for copies of complaint filed by Plaintiff Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (M,TL)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for counsel filed by Plaintiff Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (M,TL)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and USM-285 forms filed by Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285, #3 Envelope)(M,TL)
October 25, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. Also, the filer is advised that the U.S. Marshal Service requires a USM Form 285 for each individual, company, or corporation to be served. The USM Form 285 can be found at www.uscourts.gov under# Forms.. A blank civil cover sheet, and blank US Marshal forms mailed to Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter, Tuscarawas County Jail, 2295 Reiser Ave. S.E., New Philadelphia, OH 44663 (M,TL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Request for Service) filed by Plaintiff Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (M,TL)
October 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
October 25, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Jay Burrier, Orvis L. Campbell, Food Service Director. Filing fee not paid, IFP, filed by Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter. (Attachments: #1 Prison/Grievance Paperwork, #2 Envelope) (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lichtenwalter v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orvis L. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Burrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Service Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Ralph Lichtenwalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?