Reyes v. Freedom Smokes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Fontanez Reyes
Defendant: IMR Electronics, LLC., LG Chem, Ltd., Evolv, LLC, Freedom Smokes, Inc. and Expo International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv02695
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 Reply in support of #11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) filed by LG Chem, Ltd.. (Bird, Melissa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to #11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) filed by Daniel Fontanez Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rong Yuan, Ph.D., P.E.)(Lebovitz, Jordan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) filed by Defendant LG Chem, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Declaration of Joon Young Shin, #3 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Bird, Melissa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying other affiliate Twin City Fire Ins. Company, other affiliate The Hartford Group of Insurance Companies for Expo International, Inc., filed by Expo International, Inc.. (Fagnilli, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Separate Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Expo International, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Fagnilli, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Freedom Smokes, Inc.. (Adair, Nicholas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to Removal filed by Freedom Smokes, Inc.. (Adair, Nicholas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Nicholas A. Adair filed by on behalf of Freedom Smokes, Inc.. (Adair, Nicholas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: (1) Appendix A - Witness List, (2) Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
November 18, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
November 18, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Supplement to Notice of Removal, filed by LG Chem, Ltd.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading First Amended Complaint)(Bird, Melissa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent LG Corp for LG Chem, Ltd. filed by LG Chem, Ltd.. (Bird, Melissa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Summit County, case number CV-2019-07-2443 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9631457.. Filed by LG Chem, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B_Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Court Docket) (Bird, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Freedom Smokes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMR Electronics, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolv, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Smokes, Inc.
Represented By: Moira H. Pietrowski
Represented By: Nicholas A. Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expo International, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Fagnilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fontanez Reyes
Represented By: Jordan D. Lebovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?