Berg Corporation v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Plaintiff: Berg Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: Alliance Design Group, LLC, Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc., Powerpure, LLC and P.E. Alliance, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00100
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 131 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Powerpure, LLC. (Pelini, Craig) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (M,TL).
March 5, 2020 Filing 130 Motion to dismiss third-party complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted filed by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc. Related document #15 . (Holecek, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 129 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying without prejudice as moot third-party defendants' Motions to dismiss (Related Doc #53 ; #63 ; #90 ). Third-party defendants are granted 14 days from the date of this order to move or otherwise plead under Ohio law with respect to #15 the third-party complaint. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/24/2020. (D,S)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Alison R Mullins removed from case. (Related Doc #126 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/13/2020.(D,N)
February 13, 2020 Copy of NEF of Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney mailed to Alison R Mullins, Shannon Mullins, & Wright LLP, 124 S Royal Street, Alexandria, VA 22314 on 2/13/2020. (D,N)
February 12, 2020 Filing 128 Notice of Compliance and Affidavit of Christopher Norris filed by C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Document not text searchable.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chuparkoff, Stephen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 127 Motion for judgment on the pleadings (Partial) filed by P.E. Alliance, LLC. Related document(s) #15 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian T. Winchester)(Winchester, Brian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 126 Motion of Alison R. Mullins to withdraw as attorney filed by 3rd Pty Defendant P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Kenneth K. Sorteberg and Kevin B. Mattingly for Berg Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc Nos. #123 and #124 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/7/2020.(D,N) Modified to correct attorney name on 2/7/2020 (D,N).
February 6, 2020 Filing 125 Attorney Appearance by Sean T. Lavin filed on behalf of Berg Corporation. (Lavin, Sean)
February 6, 2020 Filing 124 Motion for attorney Kevin B. Mattingly, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9769753, filed by Counter-Defendant Berg Corporation, Plaintiff Berg Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kevin B. Mattingly, Esq., In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)(Boehm, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 123 Motion for attorney Kenneth K. Sorteberg, Esg. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9769713, filed by Counter-Defendant Berg Corporation, Plaintiff Berg Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Kenneth K. Sorteberg, Esq., In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)(Boehm, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 122 Attorney Appearance by David H. Boehm filed on behalf of Berg Corporation. (Boehm, David)
February 5, 2020 Filing 121 Notice of Withdrawal of attorney Kerry C. Raymond and Heather A. Rice filed on behalf of C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 120 Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit Its Affidavit Declaring Its Members and the Domicile of Each Member filed by C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chuparkoff, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit its Affidavit(s). Time extended until 2/14/2020. No further extensions will be granted. (Related Doc #120 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 2/3/2020.(D,N)
February 3, 2020 Copy of NEF of Order mailed to Kenneth K Sorteberg, Huddles Jones Sorteberg and Dachille PC, 10211 Wincopin Cir Ste 200, Columbia, MD 21044 Kerry Colleen Raymond, Franklin & Prokopik, Ste. 600, 2 North Charles Street, Baltimore, MD 21201 on 2/3/2020. (D,N)
January 31, 2020 Filing 119 Notice of Attorney Appearance of Stephen J. Chuparkoff filed on behalf of C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Craig K. Ronald's Motion to withdraw as attorney for C. Norris Manufacturing LLC; attorney Craig Kaiser Ronald removed from case. (Related Doc #118 ) Judge Sara Lioi on 1/30/2020. (D,S)
January 29, 2020 Filing 118 Motion by Craig K. Ronald to withdraw as attorney filed by C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Rarric, Owen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 117 Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel by James M. Williams filed on behalf of C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Williams, James)
January 29, 2020 Filing 116 Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Owen J. Rarric filed on behalf of C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Rarric, Owen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc.. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
January 29, 2020 Filing 114 Attorney Appearance by Craig G Pelini filed on behalf of Powerpure, LLC. (Pelini, Craig)
January 29, 2020 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
January 29, 2020 Filing 112 Answer to #15 Third party complaint filed by P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(Winchester, Brian)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting in part #111 the motion of third-party defendants Holmbury Group and Holmbury Inc. for an extension of time until 2/28/2020 to move or otherwise plead with respect to #15 the third-party complaint. Notwithstanding this extension, the moving third-party defendants are advised that the Court considers the three motions to dismiss (Doc. #53 , #63 and #90 ) that were transferred from the District of Maryland to be fully at issue and ripe for this Court's determination. No further briefing will be permitted unless requested by separate order of the Court. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/28/2020. (D,S) Modified on 1/28/2020 (D,S).
January 27, 2020 Filing 111 Motion for extension of time until 2/28/20 to answer Third-Party Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacKeigan, Jessica)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Heather A. Rice. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Kerry C. Raymond. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Kenneth K. Sorteberg. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting in part third-party defendant P.E. Alliance LLC's #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 Third Party Complaint; P.E. Alliance LLC shall move or otherwise plead by 2/21/2020. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/27/2020. (D,S)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Craig K. Ronald. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Copy of #107 Memorandum Opinion and Order and NEF of Order mailed to Alison R Mullins, Shannon Mullins & Wright LLP, 124 S Royal Street, Alexandria, VA 22314 Bryant Steven Green, Niles, Barton & Wilmer, LLP, 111 South Calvert Street, Suite 1400, Baltimore, MD 21202 Craig David Roswell, Niles Barton and Wilmer LLP, 111 S Calvert St Ste 1400, Baltimore, MD 21202 Craig Kaiser Ronald, Ronald S Landsman Attorney at Law, Six E Mulberry St, Baltimore, MD 21202 Heather Ann Rice, Franklin & Prokopik, PC, 2 North Charles Street, Suite 600, Baltimore, MD 21201 Kenneth K Sorteberg, Huddles Jones Sorteberg and Dachille PC, 10211 Wincopin Cir Ste 200, Columbia, MD 21044 Kerry Colleen Raymond, Franklin & Prokopik, Ste. 600, 2 North Charles Street, Baltimore, MD 21201 on 1/27/2020. Related document(s) #107 . (D,N)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Paul M. Finamore. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Bryant S. Green. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Alison R. Mullins. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 27, 2020 Notice to Attorney Craig D. Roswell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
January 24, 2020 Filing 110 Proposed Order re #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Third-Party Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Third-Party Defendant P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Winchester, Brian) Modified on 1/27/2020 (D,S).
January 24, 2020 Filing 109 Motion for extension of time until 2-23-2020 to answer Third-Party Plaintiff's #15 Complaint filed by Third-Party Defendant P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
January 24, 2020 Filing 108 Attorney Appearance by Brian T. Winchester filed by on behalf of P.E. Alliance, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
January 24, 2020 Filing 107 Memorandum Opinion and Order directing C. Norris Manufacturing LLC to file, on or before 2/4/2020, an affidavit to establish citizenship in support of diversity jurisdiction. See opinion for full discussion. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/24/2020. (D,S)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Paul McDermott Finamore removed from case. (Related Doc #106 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 1/24/2020.(D,N)
January 24, 2020 Copy of NEF of Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney mailed to Paul McDermott Finamore, Pessin Katz Law, P.A., 10500 Little Patuxent Parkway, Suite 650, Columbia, MD 21044 on 1/24/2020. (D,N)
January 23, 2020 Filing 106 Motion by Paul M. Finamore to withdraw as attorney filed by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc.. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
January 22, 2020 Filing 105 Attorney Appearance by Jessica L. MacKeigan filed by on behalf of Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc.. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
January 16, 2020 Filing 104 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
January 16, 2020 Filing 103 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:19-cv-00043. Electronic file, order and docket sheet received.
January 16, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (W,CM)
January 16, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (W,CM)
January 16, 2020 Copy of #104 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to Kenneth K. Sorteberg at 10211 Wincopin Cir Ste 200, Columbia, MD 21044; Craig Kaiser Ronald, Six E Mulberry St., Baltimore, MD 21202; Kerry Colleen Raymond and Heather Ann Rice, 2 North Charles Street, Suite 600, Baltimore, MD 21201; Christopher Holecek, 6055 Rockside Woods Blvd., Ste. 200, Cleveland, OH 44131, Paul McDermott Finamore, 10500 Little Patuxent Parkway, Suite 650, Columbia, MD 21044; Craig David Roswell and Bryant Steven Green, 111 South Calvert Street, Suite 1400, Baltimore, MD 21202, Nicole Lentini, 25 S Charles St. Ste., 1400, Baltimore, MD 21201; Alison R. Mullins, 124 S Royal Street, Alexandria, VA 22314 on 1/16/2020. (W,CM)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #98 C. Norris' Motion to Transfer Case; Directing the case be closed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/15/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/15/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Under 28 USC Section 1404 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant The Berg Corporation's Opposition to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff/Third-Party Plaintiff C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 filed by The Berg Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE re #96 Response, to Plaintiff's Opposition to Request Transfer filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Raymond, Kerry) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Under 28 USC Section 1404 by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Raymond, Kerry) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 96 RESPONSE re #95 Order, Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant The Berg Corporation's Opposition to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff/Third-Party Plaintiff C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Request to Transfer filed by The Berg Corporation.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER directing that the Court will postpone ruling on the third-party defendants' motions until it decides whether to transfer this entire action; Directing that Berg is to respond to C. Norris' request to transfer this action. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/11/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/11/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Powerpure, LLC.(Green, Bryant) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION to Dismiss filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order - Third Party Defendant, PowerPure LLC's, Motion to Dismiss)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss by Powerpure, LLC (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Bryant) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 89 Supplemental to #53 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by P.E. Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Alison) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant Steven Green on behalf of Powerpure, LLC (Green, Bryant) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PAPERLESS ORDER re #83 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. PowerPure's response due 10/7/19. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/28/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Holmbury, Inc..(Holecek, Christopher) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 85 QC NOTICE: #84 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Holmbury, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please refile the document by selecting Responses and Replies > Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ol, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 84 -FILED IN ERROR- RESPONSE in Support re #63 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Holmbury, Inc..(Holecek, Christopher) Modified on 8/27/2019 (ol, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT Eighth regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig David Roswell on behalf of Powerpure, LLC (Roswell, Craig) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Powerpure, LLC. Powerpure, LLC waiver sent on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/5/2019.(Roswell, Craig) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED PAPERLESS ORDER re #78 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. The next Status Report is due 8/26/19 if no motion for alternative service has been filed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/20/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER re #78 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. The next Status Report is due if no motion for alternative service has been filed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/20/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT Seventh Status Report Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PAPERLESS ORDER re #75 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. The next Status Report is due 8/19/19 if no motion for alternative service has been filed. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/9/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT Sixth Status Report Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate third party defendant Alliance Design Group, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/2/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal Partial Dismissal of Third-Party Defendant Alliance Design Group, LLC with Prejudice by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Holecek. Directing attorney Christopher Holecek to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Norris Manufacturing's response due 8/14/19. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/30/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 69 Memorandum re #53 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Opposition to P.E. Alliance,LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PAPERLESS ORDER re #66 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC: The status report is APPROVED. Another status report is due August 5, 2019, if PowerPure has not yet been served. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/24/2019. (bpgs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Norris Manufacturing's response is due July 26, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/24/2019. (bpgs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT Fifth Report Regarding Service of Third-Party Plaintiff by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Holecek (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8135063.) by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc.(Finamore, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 64 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Holmbury Limited for Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc..(Finamore, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 63 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Finamore, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #59 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff's reply due 7/26/19. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/16/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 59 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Third Party MOTION to Strike and Enter Appearance by P.E. Alliance, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 58 Third Party MOTION to Strike and Enter Appearance by P.E. Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Alison) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER re #56 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. The next Status Report is due 7/22/19 if PowerPure is not yet served. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/9/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT Fourth Status Report Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 55 Local Rule, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by P.E. Alliance, LLC identifying Other Affiliate P.E. Alliance, LLC for P.E. Alliance, LLC.(Mullins, Alison) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 54 FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL - Third Party MOTION for Disclosure by P.E. Alliance, LLC(Mullins, Alison) Modified on 7/8/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 53 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by P.E. Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Alison) Modified per chambers on 9/11/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER re #51 Status Report filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. A further Status Report is due 7/8/19 if PowerPure has not yet been served. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/25/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: P.E. Alliance, LLC, d/b/a Alliance Design Group's answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/21/2019. (bpgs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Third Party Complaint by Alliance Design Group, LLC, P.E. Alliance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lentini, Nicole) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. Holmbury Group served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. P.E. Alliance, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third-Party Complaint: Defendants Holmbury, Inc., and Holmbury Group, Inc., shall file their responses to the third-party complaint by July 24, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/21/2019. (bpgs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Third-Party Complaint. by Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc.(Finamore, Paul) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 44 QC NOTICE: #42 Affidavit of Service, and #43 Affidavit of Service, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC were filed incorrectly. **Please refile the documents by selecting Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. The documents have been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document links have been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 FILED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third-Party Complaint served on P.E. Alliance, LLC on June 4, 2019, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rice, Heather) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 FILED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third-Party Complaint served on Holmbury, Inc. and Holmbury, Group on June 1, 2019, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rice, Heather) Modified on 6/21/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER re #40 Status Report Submitted filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. The Status Report is APPROVED. C. Norris Mfg., LLC, shall file proofs of service on third party defendants who have been served. Further Status Report is due 6/24/19 if service has not been completed for remaining third party defendants. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/18/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 40 Status Report Submitted Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff's Second Report Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Directing Defendant to file status report forthwith. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/10/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER. In it's Status Report filed May 16, 2019 (ECF No. 34) Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing LLC stated they anticipated effectuating service of their Third-Party Complaint within two weeks of receiving the summonses. The Court directs Defendant to report as to the status of service by June 7, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/4/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Strike and Enter Appearance by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/28/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike and Enter Appearance by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ronald, Craig) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 35 THIRD-PARTY Summons Issued 21 days as to Alliance Design Group, LLC, Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc., P.E. Alliance, LLC, Powerpure, LLC. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Third-Party Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons Third-Party Complaint - P.E. Alliance, LLC (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons Third-Party Complaint - Alliance Design Group, LLC (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons Third-Party Complaint - Holmbury Group (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons Third-Party Complaint - Holmbury, Inc. (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons Third-Party Complaint - Powerpure, LLC (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 QC NOTICE: #23 and #27 Summons were filed incorrectly. Please attach the correct form - Third-Party Summons (AO 441). It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 27 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons to Powerpure, LLC (Rice, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons to Alliance Design Group, Inc. (Rice, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 25 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons to Holmbury, Inc. (Rice, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 24 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons to P.E. Alliance, LLC (Rice, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Summons to Holmbury Group (Rice, Heather) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant The Berg Corporation's Motion to Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim Out of Time by The Berg Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/14/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendant is directed to report the status of service of the Third Party Complaint on the Third Party Defendants on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/14/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant The Berg Corporation's Motion to Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim Out of Time by The Berg Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER re #18 Answer to Counterclaim filed by The Berg Corporation. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's answer to Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Counterclaim filed on May 9, 2019. Plaintiff's answer was due to be filed on or before May 6, 2019. Plaintiff is reminded that Court deadlines may be modified only by the Court. The Court awaits Plaintiff's motion to late-file his response. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/9/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Berg Corporation.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing the Defendant/Counter Plaintiff to file and serve within 30 days a Motion for Entry of Default as to Plaintiff/Counter Defendant The Berg Corporation, or provide a report to the Court why such motion is inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/7/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Regarding Scheduling Order by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Holmbury, Inc., Powerpure, LLC, Holmbury Group, Alliance Design Group, LLC, P.E. Alliance, LLC, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER re #13 Miscellaneous Correspondence. The Telephone Scheduling Conference that was set in for 4/29/19 is VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/15/2019. (vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff The Berg Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM against The Berg Corporation by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 Motion of defendant to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff The Berg Corporation's Opposition to Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request For Hearing filed by The Berg Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Berg Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Crushing Corporation of America, Inc., Other Affiliate NickelA, Inc., Other Affiliate BOW, Inc. for The Berg Corporation.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC Statement of Removal (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit No. 1)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/7/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Certification(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24C18006342. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637111889), filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CC Complaint, #3 CC Case Information Report, #4 CC Summons)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 1/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg Corporation v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alliance Design Group, LLC
Represented By: Nicole Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury Group
Represented By: Paul McDermott Finamore
Represented By: Christopher Holecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury, Inc.
Represented By: Paul McDermott Finamore
Represented By: Christopher Holecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Powerpure, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Steven Green
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: P.E. Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Alison R Mullins
Represented By: Nicole Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berg Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth K Sorteberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Colleen Raymond
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?