United States of America v. $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Jermaine Woodson
Case Number: 5:2020cv00168
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 02/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. (O'Neill, Mary)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Verified Claim Pursuant to Rule (G)(5) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions; Claimant's Demand for a Jury Trial Pursuant to Rule 38(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. filed by Jermaine Woodson. Related document(s) #1 .(O'Neill, Mary)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jermaine Woodson on 1/22/2020, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (J,FE)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency on 1/28/2020. Asset was taken into custody on 11/21/2019, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #2 . (L,MI)
January 24, 2020 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Jermaine Woodson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648639. (L,MI)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $27,000.00 US Currency issued to the U.S.Marshals on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Receipt and Return) (M,TL)
January 24, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
January 24, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 USMS Process and Return, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jermaine Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?