Orozco-Islas v. May
Petitioner: Carlos Orozco-Islas
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Case Number: 5:2020cv00510
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Referring Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Copy of #5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Carlos Orozco-Islas, #A753039,Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, Ohio 44901 on 3/31/2020. (S,S)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order (supplements #3 Order). Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 45 days from the date of this order; petitioner shall have 30 days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond; respondent shall have 15 days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/30/2020. (S,S)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by on behalf of Harold May. (Reese, Mary)
March 16, 2020 Copy of #3 & [non-document] Automatic Reference of Administrative Action mailed to Carlos Orozco-Islas #A753039 at Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, Ohio 44901 and Harold May, Warden at Richland Correctional Institution, 1001 S. Olivesburg Road, Mansfield, Ohio 44905 and emailed to Attorney General's Office on 3/16/20. (LC,S)
March 16, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/16/20. (LC,S)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: A petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 has been filed in this Court. The Court, having examined the petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing 2254 cases, cannot determine from the face of the petition that petitioner is not entitled to relief. THEREFORE, (1) Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within sixty (60) days from the date of this order. The answer shall comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases, and shall address all legal issues raised in the petition. (2) Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the filing of respondent's answer to respond thereto. (3) Respondent shall have fifteen (15) days from the filing of petitioner's reply brief to respond thereto. Briefs filed by the parties shall contain a summary of the facts upon which they rely and shall, where applicable, make specific reference to those portions of the record relied upon (page or exhibit number). Brief shall also contain statements of the applicable law and citations to relevant cases and statutory authorities. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/16/20. (LC,S) re #1 . Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/16/20. (LC,S)
March 5, 2020 Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Carlos Orozco-Islas at P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 3/5/20. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Y,A)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
March 5, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
March 5, 2020 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid. $5. Receipt # 14660121799. Filed by Carlos Orozco-Islas. (Attachments: #1 Proposition of Law, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco-Islas v. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Harold May
Represented By: Mary Anne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Orozco-Islas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?