Matula v. Triple H Magazine, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Matula
Defendant: Triple H Magazine, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00876
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Pursuant to General Order 2020-08 regarding COVID-19 and the related guidance provided to minimize risk of infection, the Court is, when possible, conducting matters telephonically or postponing them. To ensure that all parties are able to take part, the Telephonic Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/22/2020 at 2:00 p.m. will be conducted using the Court's AT&T Teleconference Service. Lead counsel and parties must be telephonically present. See Order for conference call details. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/19/2020. Related document(s) #17 . (JLG)
June 17, 2020 Filing 22 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Triple H Magazine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Plan)(Lycans, Andrew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Service of Court's Order dated 6.15.2020 filed by Triple H Magazine, Inc.. Related document(s) #20 .(Lycans, Andrew)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff George Matula shall have an attorney admitted to practice before the Court file a notice of appearance within 7 days of this Order. In the alternative, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant Triple H. Magazine, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint (ECF No. #18 ) within 7 days of this Order. Plaintiff is ordered to provide his contact information to the Court within that same time frame. Defense counsel shall serve this ruling on Plaintiff and file a notice on the public docket indicating such. The parties are reminded that a Telephonic Case Management Conference is scheduled for 6/22/2020 at 2:00 p.m. ECF No. #17 . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 6/15/2020. (JLG)
June 2, 2020 Filing 19 Supplement to Motion for leave to File Third-Party Complaint - Memorandum in Support of Motio for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint, filed by Triple H Magazine, Inc.. Related document(s) #18 . (Lycans, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for leave to File Third-Party Complaint filed by Defendant Triple H Magazine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint)(Lycans, Andrew)
May 5, 2020 Copy of #17 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Plaintiff's counsel Richard P. Liebowitz, Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC, 11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305, Valley Stream, NY 11580 on 5/5/2020. Related document(s) #17 . (JLG)
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Triple H Magazine, Inc.. (Lycans, Andrew)
April 24, 2020 Notice to Attorney Richard B. Liebowitz. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 23, 2020 Copy of #15 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to Richard P Liebowitz, Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC, 11 Sunrise Plz, Ste 305, Valley Stream, NY 11580 & Andrew P Lycans, Critchfield Critchfield & Johnston Ltd, 225 N Market St., Wooster, OH 44691 on 04/23/2020. (M,TL)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
April 23, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Triple H Magazine, Inc. is reminded of the requirement to file a corporate disclosure statement. (M,TL)
April 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,TL)
April 23, 2020 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern. Case number 1:20-cv-00071. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the motion to transfer case #11 , DIRECTS the Clerk to show the motion to dismiss #6 as MOOT, and ORDERS that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/23/2020. (lhc) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Based on the filing of the #11 Stipulation Regarding Transfer of Venue, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 11:00 am is vacated. Text entry order.(mr) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff George Matula. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew P Lycans PHV for The Triple H Magazine, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/7/2020. (ace) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Transfer Venue filed by The Triple H Magazine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Massaro)(McLaughlin, Rafael) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Transfer Venue by Defendant The Triple H Magazine, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Rafael) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Attorney Andrew P. Lycans to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Triple H Magazine, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4178920(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 5 replaced to include answer to court discipline question on 3/20/2020) (ace). Modified on 3/20/2020 (ace). [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Triple H Magazine, Inc..(McLaughlin, Rafael) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rafael P McLaughlin on behalf of The Triple H Magazine, Inc. (McLaughlin, Rafael) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Triple H Magazine, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
February 12, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Triple H Magazine, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4144162.), filed by George Matula. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 4/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matula v. Triple H Magazine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Matula
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple H Magazine, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P Lycans PHV
Represented By: Rafael P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Andrew P. Lycans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?