J. M. Smucker Company v. Hormel Foods Corporation
Plaintiff: J.M. Smucker Company
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv01132
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Anne Rondoni Tavernier for Hormel Foods Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/2/2020. (E,CK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Cara S. Donels for Hormel Foods Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/2/2020. (E,CK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lora M. Friedemann for Hormel Foods Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #9 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 7/2/2020. (E,CK)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Craig S. Drefcinski, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Lora M. Friedemann, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Steven J. Venenga)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hormel Foods Corporation. (Turnbull, Tracey)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Anne Rondoni Tavernier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10061188, filed by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tavernier Declaration)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Cara S. Donels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10061171, filed by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Donels)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Lora M. Friedemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10061102, filed by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Friedemann)(Turnbull, Tracey)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Granting, in part, defendant's #7 motion for extension of time to answer. Defendant will have until June 30, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/17/2020. (E,CK)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Opposition to #7 Motion for extension of time until July 16, 2020 to answer complaint filed by J.M. Smucker Company. (Moser, Christina)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until July 16, 2020 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Hormel Foods Corporation. (Turnbull, Tracey)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Hormel Foods Corporation on 5/26/2020, filed on behalf of J.M. Smucker Company Related document(s) #1 . (Moser, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Hormel Foods Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
May 26, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
May 26, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by The J. M. Smucker Company. (Moser, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The J. M. Smucker Company. (Moser, Christina)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Tortious Interference, and Unfair Competition, with jury demand against Hormel Foods Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9997497. Filed by J. M. Smucker Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 17, 2020 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 3, 2020 Email, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 9, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 24, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - May 19, 2020 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Moser, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. M. Smucker Company v. Hormel Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M. Smucker Company
Represented By: Deborah A. Wilcox
Represented By: Christina J. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?