Carrols LLC v. City of North Canton, Ohio
Plaintiff: Carrols LLC
Defendant: City of North Canton, Ohio
Case Number: 5:2020cv01578
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order rescheduling the Evidentiary Hearing to 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference (Akron) before Judge John R. Adams. (Possibly in-person in courtroom #575. Please consult with the court as the date approaches for determination of video or in-person).. Judge John R. Adams on 9/1/20. (K,C)
August 31, 2020 Filing 21 Unedited Realtime Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 8/31/2020 before Judge John R. Adams, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: 8/31/20 filed by Carrols LLC. (Mayer, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams. Telephone Conference held on 8/31/20 (Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke.)Time: 50 Mins. (K,C)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order that Defendant produce the documents referenced in its privilege log for an in camera review to assist the Court in resolving the parties discovery dispute. Judge John R. Adams on 8/31/2020. (L,J)
August 28, 2020 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing granting motion to appear pro hac vice mailed to Catherine A. Miller Akerman - Chicago, 47th Floor, 71 South Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606 on 08/28/2020. (M,TL)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Catherine A. Miller for Carrols LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #16 ). Judge John R. Adams on 08/28/2020.(M,TL)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 Supplemental Affidavit of Catherine A. Miller in support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #16 . (Mayer, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 IMPORTANT: Notice of Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 01:00 PM in to be held telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Only counsel required to participate and Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call to the Court. (M,TL)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #15 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Benjamin N. Prager for Carrols LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge John R. Adams on 8/27/2020. (O,K)
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Filing Privilege Log filed by City of North Canton, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Privilege Log)(Rarric, Owen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Catherine A. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10216689, filed by Plaintiff Carrols LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 Motion for attorney Benjamin N. Prager to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10216497, filed by Plaintiff Carrols LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Amended Joint Report and proposed procedure for Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Carrols LLC. (Mayer, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/16/2020 at 02:00 PM to be held by video conference (Akron) before Judge John R. Adams. If needed the hearing will continue on 9/17/20 at 2:00 p.m. A video conference email invitation will be received. (K,C)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by City of North Canton, Ohio. (Rarric, Owen)
July 22, 2020 FILING ERROR - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE - Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams. Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 07/22/2020. (Court Reporter: Lori Callahan.)Time: 15 minutes. Related document #2 . (M,TL) Modified to note filing error on 7/23/2020 (M,TL).
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Report on Proposed Procedure for Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #7 .(Mayer, Jeffrey) .
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Supplement to Complaint - Verification of Richard Cross, filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit A - Lease)(Mayer, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Owen J. Rarric filed by on behalf of City of North Canton, Ohio. (Rarric, Owen)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Marginal Stipulation & Order: The parties' #7 Stipulation is hereby approved and adopted as an Order of the Court. Judge John R. Adams on 07/20/2020. (M,TL).
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Stipulation and Order Submitted By Both Parties Resolving TRO motion and requesting a preliminary injunction hearing filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #2 .(Mayer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Report On Service Pursuant to the Court's July 17th Order Setting Hearing filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #5 .(Mayer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order setting a Telephonic Motion Hearing for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM telephonically before Judge John R. Adams. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to serve the complaint, its attachments, the motion for injunctive relief, and this order on Defendants by no later than noon on July 18, 2020. Plaintiff's counsel shall then file notice with the Court that indicates how and when such service was completed. Lead counsel and party representatives for both parties shall attend. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange call-in line for use and provide the number to the Courts law clerk. Judge John R. Adams on 7/17/20. (K,C)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon City of North Canton, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Carrols LLC's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Carrols LLC. Related document(s) #2 . (Mayer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for temporary restraining order with proposed order filed by Plaintiff Carrols LLC. (Mayer, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against City of North Canton, Ohio. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number BOHNDC-10112900.. Filed by Carrols LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1998 Lease and Assignment to Carrols LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Election of First Renewal Term C - Notice of Sale and Assignment to Defendant City of North Canton, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Sale and Assignment to Defendant City of North Canton, #4 Exhibit D - Purported Notice of Default, #5 Exhibit E - Purported Notice of Termination, #6 Exhibit F - April 23rd Minutes of North Canton Community Improvement Corporation, #7 Exhibit G - May 18th Proceedings Before the North Canton City Council, #8 Exhibit H - Carrols LLC Payment of June Rent, #9 Exhibit I - Magistrate's Decision in CP Commercial v. Bath & Body Works, in the Court of Common Pleas, Cuyahoga County, Ohio, #10 Exhibit J - News Article regarding purchase of Property at Issue, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons, #13 Jury Demand) (Mayer, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrols LLC v. City of North Canton, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Canton, Ohio
Represented By: Owen J. Rarric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrols LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mayer
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Represented By: Jessica A. Lopez
Represented By: Benjamin N. Prager
Represented By: Ronald S. Kopp
Represented By: Catherine A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?