Byler v Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Taunya Byler
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv01822
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on 8/20/2020 c/o U.S. Attorney, unsigned, marked C-19; Regional Chief Counsel, unsigned, marked C-19; U.S. Attorney General. Filed on behalf of Taunya Byler. Related document(s) #5 . (R,Ke)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/18/2020. (S,JM)
August 17, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 08/17/2020. (M,TL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
August 17, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,TL)
August 17, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (M,TL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Taunya Byler. (Gillissie, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Taunya Byler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for the US Attorney General, #3 Summons for the US Attorney for the ND of Ohio, #4 Summons for the Social Security Administration, #5 USM-285 for the US Attorney General, #6 USM-285 for the US Attorney for the ND of Ohio, #7 USM-285 for the Social Security Administration) (Gillissie, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byler v Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taunya Byler
Represented By: Rebecca R. Gillissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?