Bealer et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Gibson, Steven Rhoades, Jill Gibson, Karen Bealer, Bruce E. Hartman, Scott Penrod and Hannah Gibson
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Parke, Davis & Co., Warner Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company, LLC, Parke Davis & Company LLC and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01839
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Connor G. Sheehan for Karen Bealer, Hannah Gibson,Jill Gibson, Thomas Gibson, Bruce E. Hartman, Scott Penrod, and Steven Rhoades. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #10 ); granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Connor G. Sheehan for Karen Bealer,Connor G. Sheehan for Hannah Gibson,Connor G. Sheehan for Jill Gibson,Connor G. Sheehan for Thomas Gibson,Connor G. Sheehan for Bruce E. Hartman,Connor G. Sheehan for Scott Penrod,Connor G. Sheehan for Steven Rhoades. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/15/20.(K,C)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of attorney Robert A. Mosier in Support of the Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Certificates of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10342721, filed by Karen Bealer, Hannah Gibson, Jill Gibson, Thomas Gibson, Bruce E. Hartman, Scott Penrod, Steven Rhoades. (Sanders, Douglas) Modified on 10/15/2020 (K,C). Modified text to match document on 10/15/2020 (M,TL).
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of attorney Connor G. Sheehan in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Certificates of Good Standing. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10342712, filed by Karen Bealer, Hannah Gibson, Jill Gibson, Thomas Gibson, Bruce E. Hartman, Scott Penrod, Steven Rhoades. (Sanders, Douglas) Modified text on 10/15/2020 (M,TL).
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to #4 Motion for more definite statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Sanders, Douglas)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. and Other Affiliate Pfizer International LLC for Parke Davis & Company LLC filed by Parke Davis & Company LLC. (Anderson, Daniel) Modified to add Other Affiliate on 10/6/2020 (M,TL).
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Anderson, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for Warner-Lambert Company, LLC filed by Warner-Lambert Company, LLC. (Anderson, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc.; identifying Other Affiliate Wyeth Holdings LLC and Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Pharmacia LLC filed by Pharmacia LLC. (Anderson, Daniel) Modified to add Other Affiliates on 10/6/2020 (M,TL).
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for more definite statement filed by Parke Davis & Company LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner Lambert Company, Warner-Lambert Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Anderson, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 First Amended complaint against Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Parke, Davis & Company LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC and adding new party plaintiff(s) Hannah Gibson. Filed by Scott Penrod, Bruce E. Hartman, Karen Bealer, Steven Rhoades, Hannah Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Warner-Lambert Company LLC, #2 Summons - Pharmacia LLC, #3 Summons - Parke, Davis & Company LLC) (Sanders, Douglas) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (M,TL).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (T,Je)
August 19, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (T,Je)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10195864.. Filed by Scott Penrod, Bruce E. Hartman, Karen Bealer, Thomas Gibson, Steven Rhoades, Jill Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Parke, Davis & Co., #3 Summons - Pfizer, Inc., #4 Summons - Pharmacia Corporation, #5 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, #6 Summons - Warner Lambert Company, LLC) (Sanders, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bealer et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gibson
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rhoades
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Gibson
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bealer
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Hartman
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Penrod
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Gibson
Represented By: Douglas H. Sanders
Represented By: Connor G. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke Davis & Company LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Daniel M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?