Linnane v. International Enterprises Inc.
Petitioner: William Linnane
Respondent: International Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01847
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Adam D. Fuller and Scott P. Sandrock filed by on behalf of International Enterprises Inc.. (Fuller, Adam)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting petitioner's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Shelly B. Kulwin for William Linnane. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/2/2020. (E,CK)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting petitioner's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Heather K. Afra for William Linnane. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/2/2020. (E,CK)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Shelly B. Kulwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10223689, filed by Petitioner William Linnane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Shelly B. Kulwin)(Jamison, Andrew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Heather K. Afra to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10223646, filed by Petitioner William Linnane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heather K. Afra)(Jamison, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Heather K. Afra. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
August 20, 2020 Notice to Attorney Shelly B. Kulwin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Petition to Compel Arbitration Pursuant to Section 4 of the Federal Arbitration Act against International Enterprises Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number AOHNDC-10197799, filed by William Linnane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Email dated 7/27/2020, #4 Exhibit C - AAA Demand filed 6/4/2020, #5 Exhibit C-1 - AAA Receipt, #6 Exhibit D - Emails dated 8/10/2020) (Jamison, Andrew - s/Shelly B. Kulwin) Modified to add attorney name on 8/19/2020 (M,TL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linnane v. International Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Linnane
Represented By: Shelly B. Kulwin
Represented By: Andrew D. Jamison
Represented By: Heather K. Afra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: International Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Scott P. Sandrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?