Location Based Services, LLC v. Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc.
Plaintiff: Location Based Services, LLC
Defendant: Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02129
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulation & Order approving Plaintiff's #6 Stipulation for extension of time to answer. Defendant answer or responsive pleading due on or before 12/7/20. Judge John R. Adams on 11/12/20. (S,HR)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Location Based Services, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc. on 10/16/2020, filed on behalf of Location Based Services, LLC (T,Je)
October 9, 2020 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 0090 0001 4429 0783. (O,K)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Location Based Services, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Location Based Services, LLC filed by Location Based Services, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Infringement of Patent with jury demand against Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10280904.. Filed by Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US9702713, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Curfman, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
September 21, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (M,TL)
September 21, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Location Based Services, LLC v. Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alimentation Couche-Tard (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Location Based Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?