Smith v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joshua Smith
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2020cv02201
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. Related document(s) #10 . (Y,A)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for further proceedings. Related Document #9 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/5/2020. (R,Sh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Social Security Administration. (Buck, Lynne)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service through the U.S. Attorney executed upon Social Security Administration on 10/7/2020 (signed c-19), the U.S. Attorney General and the Office of the Regional Chief on 10/9/2020 (signed c-19) by FedEx, filed on behalf of Joshua Smith. Related document(s) #7 . (L,Br)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (D,Ky)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/5/20. (D,Ky)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/5/20.(D,Ky)
September 29, 2020 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 09/29/2020. (M,TL)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
September 29, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL)
September 29, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case, (M,TL)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Joshua Smith. (Braun, Katherine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Joshua Smith. (Braun, Katherine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Joshua Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Smith
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?