Crushing Corporation of America v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Plaintiff: Crushing Corporation of America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Holmbury Group, Powerpure, LLC and Holmbury, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02297
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kenneth K. Sorteberg and Kevin B. Mattingly for Crushing Corporation of America. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #23 , #24 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/17/2020.(R,Sh)
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 Motion to consolidate cases filed by Plaintiff Crushing Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Berg Corporation's Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit 2 - Crushing Corporation of America's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate)(Boehm, David)
November 14, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for attorney Kevin B. Mattingly, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10421080, filed by Plaintiff Crushing Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kevin B. Mattingly, Esq., In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)(Boehm, David)
November 14, 2020 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Kenneth K. Sorteberg, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10421079, filed by Plaintiff Crushing Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Kenneth K. Sorteberg, Esq., In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing)(Boehm, David)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by David H. Boehm filed by on behalf of Crushing Corporation of America. (Boehm, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Withdrawal and Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Attorney Heather A. Rice and adding attorney Stephen J. Chuparkoff filed by on behalf of C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC. (Chuparkoff, Stephen)
October 13, 2020 Notice to Attorney Heather Ann Rice. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,L)
October 9, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Holmbury, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (M,L) Modified on 10/9/2020 (M,L).
October 9, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,L)
October 9, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (M,L)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:20-cv-02526. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Change Venue; Transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim by Crushing Corporation of America.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Crushing Corporation of America's Opposition to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff/Third Party Plaintiff C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings and Request For Hearing filed by Crushing Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 proposed Order)(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 Third Party Summons Issued 21 days as to Holmbury Group, Holmbury, Inc, Powerpure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC re #10 Third Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 COUNTERCLAIM against Crushing Corporation of America, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Third Party Complaint filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC was filed missing information. **Please file third party summons using the event Notice (Other) and link to #10 Third Party Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Powerpure, LLC, Holmbury, Inc, Holmbury Group, filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) Modified on 9/9/2020 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendant C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. section 1404 or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay the Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC.(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Status Report Submitted Statement Concerning Removal by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crushing Corporation of America identifying Other Affiliate The Berg Corporation, Other Affiliate NickelA, Inc., Other Affiliate BOW, Inc. for Crushing Corporation of America.(Sorteberg, Kenneth) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC (Raymond, Kerry) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/2/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 2, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against C. Norris Manufacturing LLC filed by Crushing Corporation of America.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (kos, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-20-003100. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8838864), filed by C. Norris Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Writ of Summons, #5 Exhibit 3 - Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report)(Rice, Heather) [Transferred from mdd on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crushing Corporation of America v. C. Norris Manufacturing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: C. Norris Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Represented By: Stephen J. Chuparkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Powerpure, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holmbury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crushing Corporation of America
Represented By: Kevin B. Mattingly
Represented By: Kenneth K Sorteberg
Represented By: David H. Boehm
Represented By: Sean T. Lavin
Represented By: Kenneth K. Sorteberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?