Aleisa et al. v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gail Sibley, Manal Aleisa, Edward Miller, Cliff Jurkiewicz and John Marinovich
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc. doing business as Purell
Case Number: 5:2020cv02383
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Copy of Case Docket, #57 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Alexandra Nicole Fries, Jones Day, 555 South Flower Street 50th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071; Daniel Robert Johnson, Waskowski Johnson Yohalem LLP., 954 West Washington, Boulevard Suite 322, Chicago, IL 60607; Darren K Cottriel, Jones Day, 3161 Michelson Drive Suite 800, Irvine, CA 92612; David J. George, Coughlin Stoia, Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, 120 E Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500, Boca Raton, FL 33432; Gary M Klinger, Mason Lietz and Klinger LLP, 227 West Monroe Street Suite 2100, Chicago, IL 60606; George Volney Granade, Reese LLP, 8484 Wilshire, Boulevard Suite 515, Los Angeles, CA 90211; Noah M. Schubert, Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP, Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 1650, San Francisco, CA 94111; Ryan Lee McBride, Kazerouni Law Group APC, 2633 East Indian School Road Suite 460, Phoenix, AZ 85016; Seyed Abbas Kazerounian, Kazerouni Law Group APC, 245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1, Costa Mesa, CA 92626; Tammy Gruder Hussin, Hussin Law, 1596 North Coast Highway 101, Encinitas, CA 92024. (W,CM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 57 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,CM)
October 20, 2020 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Gojo Industries, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (W,CM)
October 20, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (W,CM)
October 20, 2020 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (W,CM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 56 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 2:20-cv-01045. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TOTRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.granting #46 MOTION to Transfer Case: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the Motion and ORDERS that this action shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. The Clerk of Court is directed to take all necessary steps to facilitate the transfer of this action. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Electronic docket sheet sent. Electronic Documents are accessible through PACER. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 54 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Ohio #46 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motion under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT GOJO INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO #46 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing date regarding this motion is continued from September 11, 2020 to September 15, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing will be telephonic. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will email counsel the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT GOJO INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO #46 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing date regarding this motion is continued from August 21, 2020, to September 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio #46 filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip M. Oliss)(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
July 18, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney George Volney Granade on behalf of Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley (Attorney George Volney Granade added to party Manal Aleisa(pty:pla), Attorney George Volney Granade added to party Cliff Jurkiewicz(pty:pla), Attorney George Volney Granade added to party John Marinovich(pty:pla), Attorney George Volney Granade added to party Edward Miller(pty:pla), Attorney George Volney Granade added to party Gail Sibley(pty:pla))(Granade, George) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 49 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio #46 filed by Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Coates Declaration, #2 Declaration Johnson Declaration, #3 Declaration Kazerounian Declaration)(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #47 , the briefingschedule is amended as follow: Plaintiffs' Response to Motion is due 7/17/2020. Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response is due 8/7/2020. Hearing on Motion to Transfer Venue #46 on 8/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court further finds that: (1) if the motion to transfer is denied by the Court, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint will be 14 days after entry of the order denying the motion to transfer; or (2) if the motion to transfer is granted, the response date will be set by the transferee court. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule regarding Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Macinga, #2 Exhibit A: FDA Warning Letter, #3 Proposed Order) (Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David J. George to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz, designating Seyed A. Kazerounian as local counsel #41 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz, designating Seyed A. Kazerounian as local counsel #40 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26656306) #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Gail Sibley, John Marinovich, Individually and on Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, designating Seyed A. Kazerounian as local counsel #38 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 41 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. George to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26656748) filed by Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz Cliff Jurkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Northern District of Florida, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of Florida, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26656306) filed by Plaintiff Cliff Jurkiewicz Cliff Jurkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court from the State of Washington, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs John Marinovich, Gail Sibley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26638250) filed by Plaintiffs Gail Siblev and John Marinovich John Marinovich, Gail Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Illinois, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gary K. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Gail Sibley, Edward Miller, John Marinovich, and Cliff Jurkiewicz, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, designating Seyed A. Kazerounian as local counsel #35 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Noah M Schubert counsel for Plaintiff Edward Miller. Adding Noah M. Schubert as counsel of record for Plaintiff Edward Miller for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Edward Miller. (Schubert, Noah) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Notice of Appearance #24 . The document is stricken. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 35 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/26/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26565153) filed by Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of Illinois, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Pro Hac Vice Application filed 5/26/2020 #30 . The document is stricken. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #29 , Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc. has up to and including 7/17/2020 to file its response to the Amended Complaint #23 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26565153) #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (Thrasher, Lupe) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. 2nd page of Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel not completed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 30 * STRICKEN * APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26565153) filed by Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, John Marinovich, Edward Miller, Gail Sibley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of Illinois, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (McBride, Ryan) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 5/27/2020 #34 ** Modified on 5/28/2020 (gk). [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 17, 2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #23 filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss, #2 Proposed Order)(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Johnson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary M. Klinger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David J. George. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 24 * STRICKEN * NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Noah M Schubert on behalf of Plaintiff Edward Miller (Attorney Noah M Schubert added to party Edward Miller(pty:pla))(Schubert, Noah) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 5/28/2020 #36 ** Modified on 5/28/2020 (gk). [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Manal Aleisa, Cliff Jurkiewicz, Gail Sibley, John Marinovich, Edward Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter, #2 Exhibit Website Screenshots, #3 Exhibit Twitter Posts, #4 Exhibit Innovative Biodefense Findings of Fact and Law, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Attorney's Letter, #6 Exhibit CLRA Demand Letters)(Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Gail Sibley(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Edward Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party John Marinovich(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Cliff Jurkiewicz(pty:pla))(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael R Reese on behalf of Plaintiff Manal Aleisa (Attorney Michael R Reese added to party Manal Aleisa(pty:pla))(Reese, Michael) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #19 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc. has up to and including May 22, 2020 to file its response to the current Complaint. (lom) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. This filing, together with the prior stipulation, seeks a cumulative extension of time greater than 30 days. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gojo Industries, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss, #2 Proposed Order)(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #17 , Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc. has up to and including 4/24/2020 to file its response to the current Complaint. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 24, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss, #2 Proposed Order)(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying Plaintiff Manal Aleisa and Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc. (Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Philip M. Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc., designating Darren K. Cottriel as local counsel #11 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc., designating Darren K. Cottriel as local counsel #12 . (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Stipulation #10 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant GOJO Industries, Inc. has up to and including 3/27/2020 to file its response to the Complaint. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly G. Laudon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25484817) filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip Michael Oliss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25476593) filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Gojo Industries, Inc. answer now due 3/27/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Oliss, #2 Proposed Order)(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren K Cottriel on behalf of Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. (Attorney Darren K Cottriel added to party Gojo Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cottriel, Darren) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gojo Industries, Inc. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Manal Aleisa. (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Manal Aleisa, (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Manal Aleisa. (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25237360 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Manal Aleisa. (Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Manal Aleisa(pty:pla))(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from cacd on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aleisa et al. v. Gojo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Sibley
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Daniel Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manal Aleisa
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Miller
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Noah M. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Jurkiewicz
Represented By: David J. George
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Marinovich
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: Daniel Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gojo Industries, Inc. doing business as Purell
Represented By: Darren K Cottriel
Represented By: Philip M. Oliss
Represented By: Kelly G. Laudon
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?