Noco Company v. GMI Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: GMI Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Genie Company and GMI Holdings, Inc. doing business as Genie Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv02624
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order approving Plaintiff's #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The matter is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. Judge John R. Adams on 02/12/2021. (M,TL)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 28, 2021. Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with a copy of this Order. Judge John R. Adams on 12/28/2020.(M,TL)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 28, 2021 to answer Complaint filed by Plaintiff Noco Company. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Malone, Sean)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to GMI Holdings, INC. D/B/A The Genie Company and delivered on 12/4/2020. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon GMI Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
November 23, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,MT)
November 23, 2020 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,MT)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against GMI Holdings, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10440289. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ultrasafe Certificate of Registration for Trademark 4,811,656, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ultrasafe International Registration Number 1481445, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Malone, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. GMI Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMI Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Genie Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMI Holdings, Inc. doing business as Genie Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?