Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit v. Diebold Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit
Defendant: Brinks Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Loomis Armored, Inc., Alloya Corporate Federal Credit Union, Diebold Inc., Dunbar Armored Inc. and Diebold Nixdorf
Case Number: 5:2021cv00219
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Akron Office
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 72 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Related document(s) #1 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
March 26, 2021 Filing 71 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Cross Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Related document(s) #1 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 70 Attorney Appearance by Gordon D. Woolbert, II filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Woolbert, Gordon)
March 25, 2021 Filing 69 Attorney Appearance by Kathleen A. Fox filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fox, Kathleen)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Before the Court is Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Union's motion for an extension to respond to Defendants Diebold, Inc.'s and Diebold Nixdorf Inc.'s motion to dismiss and Defendant The Brink's Company's and Dunbar Armored, Inc.'s motion to dismiss. (ECF No. #68 .) Counsel for Plaintiff was not retained until thirteen days after the motions were already pending, and on that basis, counsel seeks a twenty-day extension to respond to the pending motions. (Id., PageID #122.) It is unclear from the motion whether Plaintiff's counsel contacted opposing counsel regarding the extension, or why counsel waited until days before responses were due to request the extension. Taking all this into account, the Court GRANTS the motion (ECF No. #68 ) and extends Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the pending motions to dismiss until Wednesday, April 14, 2021. SO ORDERED. Entered by Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 3/23/2021.(L,Ja)
March 23, 2021 Filing 68 Motion for extension of time until April 14, 2021 to file response/reply to #64 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , #63 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit. Related document(s) #64 , #63 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Susany, John)
March 15, 2021 Filing 67 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant Loomis Armored, Inc.. (Dinehart, Jillian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 66 Attorney Appearance by John P. Susany filed by on behalf of Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit. (Susany, John)
February 26, 2021 Filing 65 Returned Mail addressed to Attorney Peter A. Lentini. Returned by Postal Service marked: Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Related document(s) #45 . (T,Je)
February 24, 2021 Filing 64 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brinks Company, Dunbar Armored Inc.. (Braunstein, Andrew)
February 24, 2021 Filing 63 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Diebold Inc., Diebold Nixdorf. (Smith, Chelsea)
February 24, 2021 Filing 62 Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel by Chad M. Eggspuehler filed by on behalf of Diebold Inc., Diebold Nixdorf. (Eggspuehler, Chad)
February 23, 2021 Filing 61 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/13/2021 at 2:00 PM and will be conducted telephonically before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. The Court will email counsel dial-in information prior to the conference. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties) (Y,A)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion for a second extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Union's amended complaint. (ECF No. #60 .) The Court already afforded Defendant one extension, but now it seeks until March 26, 2021 to answer or otherwise plead. (Id., PageID #58.) Relatedly, after this action was removed and transferred to this Court, counsel for Plaintiff has yet to appear, making it unlikely this additional extension will prejudice Plaintiff or the other defendants. The Court GRANTS Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion (ECF No. #60 ) and extends its deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint until March 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/23/2021. (Y,A)
February 23, 2021 Filing 60 Second Motion for extension of time until March 26, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Cross Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Related document(s) #1 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: granting Defendants Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Andrew Braunstein for Brinks Company,Andrew Braunstein for Dunbar Armored Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (ECF No. #59 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/19/2021. (Y,A)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: granting Defendants Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Joseph N. Froehlich for Brinks Company,Joseph N. Froehlich for Dunbar Armored Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (ECF No. #58 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/19/2021. (Y,A)
February 11, 2021 Filing 59 Motion for attorney Andrew M. Braunstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10640365, filed by Brinks Company, Dunbar Armored Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andrew Braunstein for Permission to Appear PHV, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Douglas R. Sargent in Support of Application for Admission PHV)(Sargent, Douglas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 58 Motion for attorney Joseph N. Froehlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10640218, filed by Brinks Company, Dunbar Armored Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph N. Froehlich for Permission to Appear PHV, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Douglas R. Sargent in Support of Application for Admission PHV)(Sargent, Douglas)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is Defendant The Brink's Company's and Brink's Incorporated's, as successor in interest to Dunbar Armored, Inc. (together Brinks), motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Union's amended complaint. (ECF No. #57 .) In its motion, Brinks seeks an extension until February 24, 2021, because it needs time to review the various orders from the transferee court before it can respond to the amended complaint. (Id., PageID #36.) Brinks did not receive consent for the extension, but that is because no counsel has appeared for Plaintiff, at least in this Court. Brinks asserts its motion is not made in bad faith or for purposes of delay. (Id.) The Court recently approved a similar request for extension by other defendants in this matter. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion (ECF No. #57 ). Brink's Company and Brink's Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/11/2021. (Y,A)
February 10, 2021 Filing 57 Motion for extension of time until February 24, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Brinks Company, Dunbar Armored Inc.. (Sargent, Douglas)
February 10, 2021 Filing 56 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Peter A. Pentini and adding attorney Jillian L. Dinehart filed by on behalf of Loomis Armored, Inc.. (Dinehart, Jillian)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is Defendant Diebold, Inc.'s and Diebold Nixdorf, Inc.'s (together Diebold) motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Union's amended complaint. (ECF No. #55 .) In its motion, Diebold seeks an extension until February 24, 2021, because it recently substituted counsel after this matter was transferred and that new counsel needs time to properly review and respond to the amended complaint. (Id., PageID #31.) Diebold represents that it obtained verbal consent for this extension from an attorney for Plaintiff, and that the extension is not requested in bad faith. (Id.) The Court recently approved a similar request for extension by another defendant in this matter. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion (ECF No. #55 ). Defendant Diebold shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/10/2021. (Y,A)
February 10, 2021 Filing 55 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 24, 2021 to Respond To Amended Complaint filed by Diebold Inc., Diebold Nixdorf. (Smith, Chelsea)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is counsel for Defendant Diebold Inc.'s motion to withdraw as attorney. (ECF No. #54 .) The motion indicates Diebold is represented by substitute counsel who will be appearing on its behalf soon and that the substitution will not delay this matter. The Court GRANTS the motion and permits Wilfred P. Coronato and Philip Stephen Pavlik, of McCarter & English, LLP, to withdraw as counsel for Diebold, Inc. and Diebold Nixdorf, Inc. in this matter. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/10/2021. (Y,A)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Before the Court is Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Financial Resources Federal Credit Union's amended complaint. (ECF No. #53 .) In its motion, JP Morgan seeks an extension until February 24, 2021, because it recently retained counsel after this matter was transferred and that new counsel needs time to properly review and respond to the amended complaint. (Id., PageID #22.) JP Morgan states it attempted to reach Plaintiff's counsel to obtain consent, but were unable to do so because opposing counsel's information is not yet available, as no one has appeared since transfer. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion (ECF No. #53 ). Defendant JP Morgan shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/10/2021. (Y,A)
February 9, 2021 Filing 53 Motion for extension of time until February 24, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Cross Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Related document(s) #1 . (Nitschke, Kathleen)
February 9, 2021 Filing 52 Attorney Appearance by Karen L. Giffen and Kathleen A. Nitschke filed by on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. (Giffen, Karen) s/ by Kathleen Nitschke. Modified text on 2/9/2021 (S,SR).
February 9, 2021 Filing 51 Attorney Appearance by Karen L. Giffen and Kathleen A. Nitschke filed by on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Nitschke, Kathleen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 54 Motion by Wilfred Coronato and Phillip Stephen Pavlick to withdraw as attorney filed by Diebold Inc., Diebold Nixdorf. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,AN)
February 3, 2021 Filing 50 Attorney Appearance by Chelsea M.C. Smith filed by on behalf of Diebold Inc., Diebold Nixdorf. (Smith, Chelsea)
February 3, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (L,MI)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/3/2021. (R,Sh)
February 1, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (R,AP)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney John G. Devlin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Anthony C. Valenziano. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Andrew Braunstein. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Joseph N. Froehlich. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Peter A. Lentini. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Phillip S. Pavlick. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Wilfred P. Coronato. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Notice to Attorney Daniel R. Bevere. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 2/1/2021. (K,K)
January 29, 2021 Filing 47 Attorney Appearance by Douglas R. Sargent filed by on behalf of Brinks Company, Dunbar Armored Inc.. (Sargent, Douglas)
January 29, 2021 Filing 46 Attorney Appearance by Jillian L. Dinehart filed by on behalf of Loomis Armored, Inc.. (Dinehart, Jillian)
January 28, 2021 Copy of docket sheet and #45 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Daniel R. Bevere at PIRO, ZINNA, CIFELLI & PARIS, ESQS. 360 PASSAIC AVENUE NUTLEY, NJ 07110; Wilfred P. Coronato at McCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP FOUR GATEWAY CENTER 100 MULBERRY STREET Newark, NJ 07102; Phillip Stephen Pavlick at McCarter & English, LLP Four Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street Newark, NJ 07102; Peter A. Lentini at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN 200 LAKE DRIVE EAST SUITE 300 CHERRY HILL, NJ 08002; Joseph N. Froehlich at Locke Lord - New York Three World Financial Center New York, NY 10281; Andrew Braunstein at LOCKE LORD LLP BROOKFIELD PLACE, 200 VESEY STREET 20TH FL NEW YORK, NY 10281; and Anthony C. Valenziano at SHERMAN WELLS SYLVESTER & STAMELMAN LLP 210 PARK AVENUE, 2ND FLOOR FLORHAM PARK, NJ 07932 on 1/28/2021. Related document(s) #45 . (T,Je)
January 28, 2021 Filing 45 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (T,Je)
January 28, 2021 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Loomis Armored, Inc. is reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (T,Je)
January 28, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (T,Je)
January 28, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (T,Je)
January 28, 2021 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 3:20-cv-06180. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 27, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (abr, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio; All three Motions to Dismiss #13 , #22 , and #29 are denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/27/2021. (abr, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 42 OPINION filed. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/27/2021. (abr, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
September 15, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/15/2020. (eh, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference set for 9/15/2020 at has been converted to a telephone status conference. (No joint discovery plan required.) Plaintiffs counsel is to initiate the call to 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/8/2020. (eh, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC. re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to Crossclaim by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Loomis Armored by BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC..(BRAUNSTEIN, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 37 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Defendant Loomis Armored, Inc. by DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF.(CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 35 Defendant Loomis Armored US, LLC AMENDE ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First CROSSCLAIM of Loomis Armored US, LLC against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., First COUNTERCLAIM of Loomis Armored US, LLC against FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT by LOOMIS ARMORED, INC..(LENTINI, PETER) Modified on 8/14/2020 (abr). [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 33 Loomis Armored US, LLC ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First CROSSCLAIM of Loomis Armored US, LLC against BRINKS COMPANY, DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF, DUNBAR ARMORED INC., JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. by LOOMIS ARMORED, INC..(LENTINI, PETER) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUNBAR ARMORED INC. identifying The Brink's Company as Corporate Parent.. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRINKS COMPANY identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH NICHOLAS FROEHLICH on behalf of DUNBAR ARMORED INC. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW BRAUNSTEIN on behalf of BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC. (BRAUNSTEIN, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF re #12 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 20, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/17/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT re #13 MOTION to Dismiss (BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT re #12 MOTION to Change Venue (BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BRINKS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/27/2020. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Brinks Company.. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH NICHOLAS FROEHLICH on behalf of BRINKS COMPANY (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion reset for 8/3/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #17 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/20/2020. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT re #12 MOTION to Change Venue (BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A... (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY C. VALENZIANO on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (VALENZIANO, ANTHONY) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC., JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., LOOMIS ARMORED, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Summons to be Issued by FINANCIAL RESOURCES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIT as to BRINKS COMPANY, DUNBAR ARMORED INC., JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., LOOMIS ARMORED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BEVERE, DANIEL) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 9/15/2020 at 10:00AM. (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq., #3 Proposed Order)(CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 7/20/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq., #3 Proposed Order)(CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting extension to answer for Defendants Diebold Nixdorf, Inc. and Diebold,Incorporated to 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/12/2020. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIEBOLD INC.. (CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIEBOLD NIXDORF. (CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP STEPHEN PAVLICK on behalf of DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF (PAVLICK, PHILLIP) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILFRED P. CORONATO on behalf of DIEBOLD INC., DIEBOLD NIXDORF (CORONATO, WILFRED) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 6, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ALLOYA CORPORATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (DEVLIN, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 Supplemental MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 3, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Motion to change venue and #4 Motion to change venue submitted by John Devlin on 6/2/2020 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (abr) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of John Collins re #4 Supplemental MOTION to Change Venue by ALLOYA CORPORATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (DEVLIN, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental MOTION to Change Venue by ALLOYA CORPORATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Motion, #3 Certification Cert of Concurrence, #4 Brief memo of law, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Certificate of Service)(DEVLIN, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by ALLOYA CORPORATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Motion, #2 Brief Memo of Law, #3 Certification Cert of concurrence, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Certificate of Service)(DEVLIN, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/22/2020. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alloya Corporate Federal Credit Union from Somerset, case number SOM-L-484-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10842531), filed by Alloya Corporate Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certification, #3 Notice to Adverse Parties, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O)(DEVLIN, JOHN) [Transferred from njd on 1/28/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit v. Diebold Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Resources Federal Credit Unit
Represented By: Daniel R. Bevere
Represented By: Gordon D. Woolbert, II
Represented By: John P. Susany
Represented By: Kathleen A. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinks Company
Represented By: Joseph N. Froehlich
Represented By: Andrew Braunstein
Represented By: Andrew M. Braunstein
Represented By: Douglas R. Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Anthony C. Valenziano
Represented By: Kathleen A. Nitschke
Represented By: Karen L. Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Armored, Inc.
Represented By: Peter A. Lentini
Represented By: Jillian L. Dinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alloya Corporate Federal Credit Union
Represented By: John Gerard Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diebold Inc.
Represented By: Wilfred P. Coronato
Represented By: Phillip Stephen Pavlick
Represented By: Chelsea M.C. Smith
Represented By: Phillip S. Pavlick
Represented By: Chad M. Eggspuehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunbar Armored Inc.
Represented By: Joseph N. Froehlich
Represented By: Andrew Braunstein
Represented By: Andrew M. Braunstein
Represented By: Douglas R. Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diebold Nixdorf
Represented By: Wilfred P. Coronato
Represented By: Phillip Stephen Pavlick
Represented By: Chelsea M.C. Smith
Represented By: Phillip S. Pavlick
Represented By: Chad M. Eggspuehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?