O'Brien v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shawn O'Brien
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv00506
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 3/9/2021; by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security on 3/10/2021 and upon U.S. Attorney General on 3/10/2021 (signed C19) filed on behalf of Shawn O'Brien. (Related document #8 ). (O,K)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal forms) (P,G)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (P,G)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 16.3.1)(P,G)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #3 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/8/2021.(P,G)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Shawn O'Brien. (Wilson, Rachel)
March 4, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,TL)
March 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
March 4, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 03/04/2021. (M,TL)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT SUBMITTED - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Shawn O'Brien. (Wilson, Rachel) Modified to note filing error on 3/4/2021 (M,TL).
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Shawn O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst. US Atty for ND of Ohio, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst US Atty for ND of OH) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn O'Brien
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?