Solidstrip, Inc. v. U.S. Technology Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Solidstrip, Inc.
Defendant: Raymond F Williams, Daryl Duncan, Anthony Giancola, Mark E. Cundiff, U.S. Technology Corporation, Penny Duncan, Missouri Green Materials and U.S. Technology Media Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv00731
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Cooper, Constance)
May 26, 2021 Filing 78 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Cooper, Constance)
May 26, 2021 Filing 77 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F Williams. (Mills, Laura)
May 21, 2021 Filing 76 Reply in support of #73 Motion for Attachment filed by Solidstrip, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2021 Filing 75 Response to #73 Motion for Attachment filed by U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F Williams. (Mills, Laura)
May 13, 2021 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Solidstrip, Inc.. (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah)
May 7, 2021 Filing 73 Motion for Attachment filed by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - interest calculation, #3 Proposed Order Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Andrew W. Stromdahl)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 72 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ( re #69 ). Anthony Giancola's and U.S. Technology Media Corporation's answers due 5/26/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 4/28/21.(K,C)
April 29, 2021 Filing 71 Marginal Entry Order denying as moot Defendants' #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #68 pursuant to the Court's ruling on Doc. #69 . Judge John R. Adams on 4/28/21.(K,C)
April 28, 2021 Filing 70 Returned Mail addressed to Attorney Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson, marked "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward." Notice of Electronic Filing of case reassignment to Judge Adams re-mailed to Sarah Troupis Ferguson, Hansen Reynolds, Ste. 800, 10 East Doty Street, Madison, WI 53703. (M,TL)
April 26, 2021 Filing 69 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 26, 2021 to answer filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Lowther, Joshua)
April 26, 2021 Filing 68 Motion for extension of time to answer filed by U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mills, Laura)
April 19, 2021 Filing 67 Returned Mail addressed to Attorney Timothy M. Hansen, returned from USPS marker "Returned to Sender Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward". Copy of #56 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet re-mailed to attorney at Hansen Reynolds, 301 N. Broadway, Ste. 400, Milwaukee, WI 53202. Docket updated to reflect the new address. (M,TL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 66 Returned Mail addressed to Attorney Sarah Troupis Ferguson. Copy of #56 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet returned by USPS marked "Returned to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward." Copies re-mailed to attorney at Hansen Reynolds, Ste. 800, 10 East Doty Street, Madison, WI 53703. (M,TL)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Joshua S. Lowther and attorney Constance Cooper for Anthony Giancola and U.S. Technology Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #64 ) & (Related Doc #65 ). Judge John R. Adams on 4/19/21.(K,C)
April 16, 2021 Filing 65 Motion for attorney Constance Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 54660007946, filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope)(T,Je)
April 16, 2021 Filing 64 Motion for attorney Joshua Sabert Lowther to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 54660007946, filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope)(T,Je) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #3 File Stamped Copy of Motion) (T,Je)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jeffrey R Rosenberg,attorney Gerard W. Cook, and attorney Sarah Troupis Ferguson for Solidstrip, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #60 );(Related Doc #61 );(Related Doc #62 ). Judge John R. Adams on 4/14/21.(K,C)
April 13, 2021 Filing 63 Notice of Filing Affidavit of Sarah Troupis Ferguson in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Solidstrip, Inc.. Related document(s) #62 .(McMillan, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 62 Motion for attorney Sarah Troupis Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10775008, filed by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (McMillan, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 61 Motion for attorney Gerard W. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10774998, filed by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Gerard W. Cook)(McMillan, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 60 Motion for attorney Jeffrey R. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10774977, filed by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Rosenberg)(McMillan, Kevin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 59 Attorney Appearance by Kevin R. McMillan and Jonathan F. Sobel filed on behalf of Solidstrip, Inc.. (McMillan, Kevin)
April 7, 2021 Notice to Attorney Jeffrey R. Rosenberg. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 7, 2021 Notice to Attorney Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 7, 2021 Notice to Attorney Timothy M. Hansen. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 7, 2021 Notice to Attorney Constance Cooper. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 7, 2021 Notice to Attorney Joshua Sabert Lowther. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/6/2021. (E,CK)
April 6, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. Judge Sara Lioi terminated. (M,TL)
April 6, 2021 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing of reassignment of case from Judge Lioi to Judge Adams mailed to Jeffrey R Rosenberg, O'Halloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, 650 Dundee Road, Suite 475, Northbrook, IL 60062; Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson, Hansen Reynolds Dickinson Crueger, Historic Landmark Building, 316 N. Milwaukee Street, Suite 200, Milwaukee, WI 53202; Constance Cooper, Lowther Walker LLC, 101 Marietta St., NW, Ste. 3325, Atlanta, GA 30303; Joshua Sabert Lowther, Lowther Walker LLC, Centennial Tower, 101 Marietta Street, NW, Ste. 3325, Atlanta, GA 30303; Mark E. Cundiff, 2893 Forest Ridge Drive, Macon, GA 31204 on 04/06/2021. (M,TL)
April 5, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F Williams. (Mills, Laura)
April 5, 2021 Filing 56 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
April 5, 2021 Filing 55 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western. Case number 3:20-cv-00822. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 5, 2021 Copy of #56 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to Jeffrey R Rosenberg, O'Halloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, 650 Dundee Road, Suite 475, Northbrook, IL 60062; Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson, Hansen Reynolds Dickinson Crueger, Historic Landmark Building, 316 N. Milwaukee Street, Suite 200, Milwaukee, WI 53202; Timothy M. Hansen, Hansen Reynolds Dickinson Crueger, Ste. 200, 316 North Milwaukee Street, Milwaukee, WI 53202; Constance Cooper, Lowther Walker LLC, 101 Marietta St., NW, Ste. 3325, Atlanta, GA 30303; Joshua Sabert Lowther, Lowther | Walker LLC, Centennial Tower, 101 Marietta Street, NW, Ste. 3325, Atlanta, GA 30303; Mark E. Cundiff, 2893 Forest Ridge Drive, Macon, GA 31204 on 04/05/2021. (M,TL)
April 5, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
April 5, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
April 5, 2021 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), Solidstrip, Inc., U.S. Technology Corporation and U.S. Technology Media Corporation are reminded of their requirement to file a corporate disclosure statement. (M,TL)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Defendants' motions to transfer this case to the Northern District of Ohio, Dkt. #27 and #32 , are GRANTED. The clerk of court is directed to transfer the case. Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc's motion for a writ of attachment, Dkt. #45 , is DENIED without prejudice. Defendants' motion to stay, Dkt. #51 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/2/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 53 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc. re: #51 Motion to Stay filed by Raymond F. Williams, U.S. Technology Corporation (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendants move to stay the proceedings pending a resolution of their motion to dismiss the case for lack of personal jurisdiction, or, in the alternative to transfer venue. Dkt. #51 . Plaintiff may have until February 17, 2021, to file a response. No reply is necessary. Briefing on plaintiff's motion for a writ of attachment, Dkt. #45 , is stayed pending a decision on the motion to stay. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/10/2021. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 51 Motion to Stay Proceedings by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Mills, Laura),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 50 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation (Cooper, Constance),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and adopting #47 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 01/27/21. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 48 Notice by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Mills, Laura),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 47 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Cooper, Constance),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to Plaintiff's #45 Motion for Writ of Attachment. Defendants' Brief(s) in Opposition due 2/16/2021. Plaintiff's Brief in Reply due 2/26/2021. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 46 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc. (Hansen, Timothy),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 45 Motion for Writ of Attachment by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 9-8-20) (Rosenberg, Jeffrey),(ps) Modified on 1/25/2021: Multiple exhibits attached to the complaint. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 44 Affidavit of Andrew W. Stromdahl re: #45 Motion for Writ of Attachment. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey),(ps) Modified on 1/25/2021. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 43 Disregard. Modified on 1/25/2021. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Pretrial Conference Order (pro se version) - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/15/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Pretrial Conference Order (counsel version) - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Dispositive Motions due 11/15/2021. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and all motions in limine due 4/1/2022. Responses due 4/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/15/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 40 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc., Discovery Plan (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference - Pro Se held on 1/12/2021 [:20] (cak),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 39 Cover letter requesting court assistance in recruiting counsel by Defendant Mark E. Cundiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER filed pro se by Defendant Mark E. Cundiff. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 37 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc. re: #32 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/28/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 Brief in Reply by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams in Support of #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Mills, Laura) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 35 Declaration of Andrew W. Stromdahl filed by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc. re: #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 34 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc. re: #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Raymond F. Williams, U.S. Technology Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Caseload Profile) (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 33 Disregard. Modified on 12/4/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 12/24/2020. Brief in Reply due 1/4/2021. (Cooper, Constance) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 31 Summons Returned Executed. Missouri Green Materials served on 11/21/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 30 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Mark E. Cundiff. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 29 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Cook, Gerard) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Returned Executed. Mark E. Cundiff served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Daryl Duncan served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Penny Duncan served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Troupis Ferguson, Sarah) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. Brief in Opposition due 12/8/2020. Brief in Reply due 12/18/2020. (Mills, Laura) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 12/3/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service as to defendants Mark E. Cundiff, Missouri Green Materials, Daryl Duncan and Penny Duncan. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Constance Cooper for Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Cooper, Constance) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #24 Motion to Admit Jeffrey R. Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/13/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 24 Motion to Admit Jeffrey R Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2782528.) by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/10/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc., and by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cooper, Constance) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 Unsigned Notice of Appearance filed by Constance Cooper for Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Cooper, Constance) Modified on 11/12/2020: Signed document filed? (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Giancola answer due 12/3/2020; U.S. Technology Media Corporation answer due 12/3/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation answer and Raymond F. Williams answer due 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/26/2020. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 Supplement re: #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Mills, Laura) Modified on 10/23/2020. (lak). [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. Response due 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mills, Laura) Modified on 10/22/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Laura L. Mills for Defendants U.S. Technology Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Mills, Laura) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Stipulation (Dkt. #15 ) accepted, extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Anthony Giancola answer due 11/12/2020; U.S. Technology Media Corporation answer due 11/12/2020. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 18, 2020 Filing 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Lowther, Joshua) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Sabert Lowther for Defendants Anthony Giancola, U.S. Technology Media Corporation. (Lowther, Joshua) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Raymond F. Williams. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Mark E. Cundiff. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Cook, Gerard) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Cook, Gerard) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Solidstrip, Inc.. (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit E - UST Indictment (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit D - Missouri Case 17-CV-189 Docket Sheet (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit C - Cundiff Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit B - UST Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,, filed by Solidstrip, Inc. Exhibit A - Williams Plea Agreement (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark E. Cundiff, Daryl Duncan, Penny Duncan, Anthony Giancola, Missouri Green Materials, U.S. Technology Corporation, U.S. Technology Media Corporation, Raymond F. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons Raymond F. Williams, #2 Summons U.S. Technology Media Corporation, #3 Summons Anthony Giancola, #4 Summons Mark E. Cundiff, #5 Summons Missouri Green Materials, #6 Summons Daryl Duncan, #7 Summons Penny Duncan) (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Disregard. Modified on 9/9/2020. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2744151.), filed by Solidstrip, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to U.S. Technology Corporation, #4 Summons to Raymond Williams, #5 Summons to U.S. Technology Media Corporation, #6 Summons to Anthony Giancola, #7 Summons to Mark Cundiff, #8 Summons to Missouri Green Materials, #9 Summons to Daryl Duncan, #10 Summons to Penny Duncan) (Hansen, Timothy) [Transferred from wiwd on 4/5/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solidstrip, Inc. v. U.S. Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond F Williams
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Constance Cooper
Represented By: Pierce C. Walker
Represented By: Joshua S. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Giancola
Represented By: Constance Cooper
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Represented By: Joshua S. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Technology Corporation
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Constance Cooper
Represented By: Pierce C. Walker
Represented By: Joshua S. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Green Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Technology Media Corporation
Represented By: Constance Cooper
Represented By: Joshua Sabert Lowther
Represented By: Joshua S. Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solidstrip, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. Hansen
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis Ferguson
Represented By: Jeffrey R Rosenberg
Represented By: Kevin R. McMillan
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Rosenberg
Represented By: Jonathan F. Sobel
Represented By: Gerard W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?