Kirsch et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carrie Kirsch and Martin Kirsch
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00912
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (E,CK)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 8/18/2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 7/28/2021. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/4/2021. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Meola, Margo)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's motion for an extension of time until June 21, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Doc. No. #9 ) is GRANTED. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/14/2021. (E,CK)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 Second Motion for extension of time until June 21, 2021 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Meola, Margo)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of receipt of original state court record received on 5/13/21 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #6 . (M,TL)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order [non-document] granting defendant's #5 Motion for extension of time until June 7, 2021 to answer plaintiff's complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/11/2021. (E,CK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CV000440. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter of Acknowledgment) (M,TL)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until June 7, 2021 to answer plaintiff's complaint filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Meola, Margo)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying other affiliates Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, and Allstate Corporation filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Meola, Margo) Modified on 5/18/2021 to add other affiliates (D,Ju).
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 05/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Common Pleas Court, case number 2021 CV 00440 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10812962.. Filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Meola, Margo)
May 3, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 3, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirsch et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Kirsch
Represented By: James A. DeSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kirsch
Represented By: James A. DeSmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: David Cooper Comstock, Jr.
Represented By: Margo Stoffel Meola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?