Papczun v. NUCO Education Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kent Papczun
Defendant: Brian Parker and NUCO Education Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv01003
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 8/13/2021; Deadline for completing fact discovery 1/7/2022; The parties have agreed to a method for conducting discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 6/6/2022; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 7/8/2022; Deadline for completing expert discovery 8/5/2022; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 2/2/2022; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 3/4/2022; Deadline for filing replies to responses 3/18/2022; Status Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 9/6/2022 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (E,CK)
July 9, 2021 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On July 9, 2021, the Court conducted a telephonic case management conference. Attorneys Taurean Shattuck and Anne Laurie McClurkin participated. The Court discussed with counsel dates and deadlines that will appear in the Court's case management plan and trial order. The Court also discussed with counsel the scope of discovery, and the parties agreed to conduct discovery within the limits of the Court's rules governing standard track assignments. Counsel were advised that the Court requires the filing of joint 45-day status reports. If at any time counsel and the parties should desire the Courts assistance with scheduling or facilitating mediation, counsel may so indicate in a status report or by contacting chambers directly. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 10 minutes. (E,CK)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Fruin, Peter)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendants' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Anne Laurie McClurkin for NUCO Education Corporation and Brian Parker. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Doc. No. #7 .) Judge Sara Lioi on 5/28/2021. (E,CK)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Anne Laurie McClurkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10853016, filed by NUCO Education Corporation, Brian Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Fruin, Peter)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 7/9/2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 6/18/2021. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 6/25/2021. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Magistrage Consent Packet) (E,CK)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint filed by NUCO Education Corporation, Brian Parker. (Fruin, Peter)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 05/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
May 14, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 14, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Education Affiliates, Inc., Other Affiliate The Marco Group, Inc. for NUCO Education Corporation filed by NUCO Education Corporation. (Fruin, Peter)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Please of Summit County, OH, case number CV-2021-04-1187 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10832072.. Filed by Brian Parker, NUCO Education Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail / Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 - Summit County Docket) (Fruin, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papczun v. NUCO Education Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Parker
Represented By: Peter S. Fruin
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUCO Education Corporation
Represented By: Peter S. Fruin
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Papczun
Represented By: Daniel S. Dubow
Represented By: Taurean J. Shattuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?