Reffett v. City of New Philadelphia, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Steven Reffett
Defendant: Chad Dorsey, City of New Philadelphia, Ohio and Michael Goodwin
Case Number: 5:2021cv01211
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by City of New Philadelphia, Ohio, Chad Dorsey, Michael Goodwin. (Williams, Terence)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Local Rule 30.1, #3 Magistrate Consent Form, #4 Budget, #5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(L,J)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Marginal Entry Order granting #3 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers now due due 8/27/2021. Judge John R. Adams on 7/6/2021.(L,J)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for extension of time until August 27, 2021 to answer , move or plead to complaint filed by City of New Philadelphia, Ohio, Chad Dorsey, Michael Goodwin. (Williams, Terence)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Attorney John P.M. Rutan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Tuscarawas Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021 CT 05 0326 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10891362.. Filed by Chad Dorsey, City of New Philadelphia, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint & Summons) (McLandrich, John)
June 21, 2021 Copy of #2 Magistrate Consent Form and docket sheet mailed to John P.M. Rutan, 336 South High Street, Columbus, OH 43215 on 06/21/2021. (M,TL)
June 21, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
June 21, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reffett v. City of New Philadelphia, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Reffett
Represented By: John P.M. Rutan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Dorsey
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Philadelphia, Ohio
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Represented By: John T. McLandrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goodwin
Represented By: Terence L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?