Cornett v. Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Cornett
Defendant: Dominique Fennel, David Hendrix, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC and Robyn Rohrbacher
Case Number: 5:2021cv01280
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 Case Management Conference Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 8/26/2021; Deadline for completing fact discovery 4/29/2022; The parties have agreed to follow the default standard for discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 4/29/2022; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 5/30/2022; Deadline for completing expert discovery 6/30/2022; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 7/29/2022; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 8/26/2022; Deadline for filing replies to responses 9/9/2922; Status Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 12/12/2022 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C - Witness List) (E,CK)
August 26, 2021 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephonic Case Management Conference was conducted on 8/26/2021 by Judge Sara Lioi. Attorney Bradley Levine participated on behalf of plaintiff; Attorneys Christian McFarland and Ryan Morley participated on behalf of defendants. Counsel advised that plaintiff has made a settlement demand, which defendants have under consideration. Parties and counsel are working cooperatively and will continue to work in good faith to resolve the matter. The Court advised counsel of the requirement that they jointly file 45-day status reports and indicated that they may use that vehicle, or a motion, to request the assistance of a court mediator or the magistrate judge should that become desirable for their mediation. The Court reviewed all the case management dates and deadlines; the same will issue by separate order. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 8 minutes. (E,CK)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(F) and L.R. 16.3(B)(3) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Dominique Fennel, David Hendrix, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Robyn Rohrbacher. (McFarland, Christian)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of receipt of state court records by Stark County Court of Common Pleas on 7/23/21. Related document(s) #8 . (M,TL)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021 CV 00468. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment Letter) (M,TL)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (E,CK)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 8/26/2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/5/2021. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 8/12/2021. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting) (E,CK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Dominique Fennel, David Hendrix, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Robyn Rohrbacher. (Morley, Ryan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (O,K)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (O,K)
July 2, 2021 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Paid Twice for Notice of Removal. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10913711, filed by Dominique Fennel, David Hendrix, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Robyn Rohrbacher. Related document(s) #1 . (Morley, Ryan)
July 2, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K)
July 2, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Company LP for Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC filed by Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC. (Morley, Ryan) Modified filers on 7/2/2021 (O,K).
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021 CV 00468 with jury demand Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10913742. Filed by Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, David Hendrix, Dominique Fennel and Robyn Rohrbacher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morley, Ryan) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (O,K).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornett v. Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Cornett
Represented By: Bradley Levine
Represented By: Stephan I. Voudris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Fennel
Represented By: Ryan J. Morley
Represented By: Christian D. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hendrix
Represented By: Ryan J. Morley
Represented By: Christian D. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC
Represented By: Ryan J. Morley
Represented By: Christian D. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Rohrbacher
Represented By: Christian D. McFarland
Represented By: Ryan J. Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?