Hightower v. Keystone Automotive Industries et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Hightower and Ronnie J. Hightower
Defendant: Keystone Automotive Indus., LKQ Corp. and Keystone Automotive Industries
Case Number: 5:2021cv01792
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by personal service executed upon LKQ Corp. on 11/11/2021, filed on behalf of Ronnie J. Hightower (Taubman, Bruce)
November 11, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Ronnie J. Hightower on 11/11/2021, filed on behalf of Ronnie J. Hightower (Taubman, Bruce)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Keystone Automotive Industries and LKQ Corp.. (O,K)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Ronnie J. Hightower. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Taubman, Bruce)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Ronnie J. Hightower. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Taubman, Bruce) Modified to mark error, not flattened creating errors to be refiled on 11/2/2021 (O,K).
October 1, 2021 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-15. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (V,AR)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brian Taubman filed by Plaintiff Ronnie J. Hightower. (Taubman, Bruce - /s by Brian Taubman) Modified text, document is not a motion on 9/29/2021 (O,K).
September 22, 2021 Notice to Attorney Brian M. Taubman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (O,K)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (O,K)
September 20, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K)
September 20, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Taubman, Bruce)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11040806.. Filed by Ronnie J Hightower. (Taubman, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Keystone Automotive Industries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Hightower
Represented By: Brian M. Taubman
Represented By: Bruce D. Taubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie J. Hightower
Represented By: Brian M. Taubman
Represented By: Bruce D. Taubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Automotive Indus.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKQ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Automotive Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?