Smith Land Company, Inc, et al v City of Fairlawn, Ohio, et al
Plaintiff: Smith Land Company, Inc and Robert G. Smith
Defendant: City of Fairlawn, Ohio, Mayor William J. Roth, Chris Randles, Ed Wilk, Ohio EPA, Shawn A. Herhold and Malavanh D. Rassavong
Case Number: 5:2021cv01848
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Shawn A. Herhold on 11/16/2021, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document #8 . (O,K)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon City of Fairlawn, Ohio on 11/12/2021; Chris Randles on 11/12/2021 no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website; William J. Roth on 11/12/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document #8 . (O,K)
November 10, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to City of Fairlawn, Ohio (Rec # 7019 1640 0000 9440 2304), Shawn A. Herhold (Rec # 7020 3160 0001 2621 4157), Ohio EPA (Rec # 7020 3160 0001 2621 4171), Chris Randles(Rec # 7020 3160 0001 2619 9584), Malavanh D. Rassavong (Rec # 7020 3160 0001 2621 4164), William J. Roth (Rec # 7019 1640 0000 9440 2311), Ed Wilk (Rec # 7020 3160 0001 2631 4188) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (T,Je)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon City of Fairlawn, Ohio, Shawn A. Herhold, Ohio EPA, Chris Randles, Malavanh D. Rassavong, William J. Roth, Ed Wilk. (T,Je)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Smith Land Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Edwards-Smith, Karen)
November 8, 2021 Remark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $402 refunded on 10/19/21. (W,L)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 09/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (M,TL)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Judge John R. Adams on 9/30/21. (K,C)
September 30, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. Judge John R. Adams terminated. (M,TL)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Edwards-Smith, Karen)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Mendenhall, Warner)
September 29, 2021 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Double Payment. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Mendenhall, Warner)
September 29, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
September 29, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
September 29, 2021 Notice by Clerk that Smith Land Company, Inc failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,TL)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief, Civil Conspiracy to Commit Fraud, Trespass, Taking of Property, Ex Post Facto Enforcement, Damages and Exemplary Damages against City of Fairlawn, Ohio, Shawn Herhold, Ohio EPA, Chris Randles, Malavanh Rassavong, William J. Roth, Jr, Ed Wilk. Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11057275, filed by Smith Land Company, Inc and Robert G. Smith. (Mendenhall, Warner) Modified filers and text on 9/29/2021 (M,TL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Land Company, Inc, et al v City of Fairlawn, Ohio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Land Company, Inc
Represented By: Karen L. Edwards-Smith
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Smith
Represented By: Karen L. Edwards-Smith
Represented By: Warner Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairlawn, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor William J. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Randles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn A. Herhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malavanh D. Rassavong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?