United States of America v. Hatala
Plaintiff: United States of America
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Barbara Hatala
3Rd Party Defendant: Melva J Gibbs, Deanna C Leahy and Donald Miller
Case Number: 5:2021cv02140
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 Amended Answer of Third Party Defendant Melva Gibbs to Defendant Third Party Plaintiff Barbara Hatala Third Party Complaint Answer to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Third party complaint, filed by Melva J Gibbs. (Schoenberger, Josh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Third Party Summons issued for service upon Deanna C Leahy (alias), Donald Miller. (M,TL)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 Praecipe for issuance of Third Party Summons filed by Barbara Hatala. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Donald Miller, #2 Summons Donna Leahy)(Sutherland, Robert) Modified event on 1/5/2022 (M,TL).
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 Answer to #4 Answer to Complaint, Third party complaint, filed by Melva J Gibbs. (Schoenberger, Josh) Modified text on 1/5/2022 (M,TL).
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Answer to #7 Answer to Complaint, Third party complaint , Third party complaint against Deanna C Leahy, Donald Miller filed by Barbara Hatala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Sutherland, Robert)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, Third party complaint against Deanna C Leahy, Donald Miller filed by Barbara Hatala. (Sutherland, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Melva J. Gibbs on 12/15/2021, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document #5 . (O,K)
December 13, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Deanna C Leahy placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7014 0150 0001 1062 9845 and Melva J. Gibbs certified number 7014 0150 0001 1062 9838. (P,G)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 Third Party Summons issued for service upon Melva J Gibbs, Deanna C Leahy. (M,TL)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Third party complaint against Melva J Gibbs, Deanna C Leahy filed by Barbara Hatala. (Attachments: #1 Complaint USA Complaint, #2 Summons Melva Gibbs, #3 Summons Deanna Leahy)(Sutherland, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Barbara Hatala on 11/17/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) #2 . (L,Br)
November 15, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Barbara Hatala placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70151660000011648721. (L,Br)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Barbara Hatala. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (O,K)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Barbara Hatala. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Deucher, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (O,K)
November 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hatala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brendan F. Barker
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Deucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Barbara Hatala
Represented By: Christine M. Gaynor
Represented By: Robert B. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Melva J Gibbs
Represented By: Josh L. Schoenberger
Represented By: Susan S.R. Petro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Deanna C Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Donald Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?