Talis Biomedical Corporation v. Talis Clinical, LLC
Plaintiff: Talis Biomedical Corporation
Defendant: Talis Clinical, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv02141
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulation and Order approving the parties' #25 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege, Work Product Protection, or Other Applicable Privilege. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/20/2022. (JLG)
April 14, 2022 Filing 25 Joint Proposed Stipulation regarding Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege, Work Product Protection, or Other Applicable Privilege filed by Talis Clinical, LLC. (Barnes, Cory)
April 14, 2022 Filing 24 Answer to Counterclaims to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Lauter, Judd) Modified on 4/29/2022 (D,Ju).
March 30, 2022 Filing 23 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track, and is suitable for mediation. The parties may engage a private mediator. Should the latter occur, the Court would like to be apprised. The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Fact Discovery shall be completed on or before 11/16/2022. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before 2/16/2023. The affirmative expert disclosure cutoff is 12/16/2022, with the rebuttal expert disclosure cutoff on 1/17/2023. Counsel shall comply with LR 37.1, which outlines a process for resolution of discovery disputes. The parties shall file a proposed stipulation regarding inadvertent disclosures on or before 4/14/2022. The cutoff to amend the pleadings in this case is 7/15/2022. The cutoff for filing dispositive motions is 3/16/2023, with responses filed by 4/15/2023, and replies by 4/29/2023. Written stipulations as to all uncontested facts to be presented by the dispositive motion shall be due upon filing dispositive motions. If there are no stipulations, a joint notice stating same shall be filed by the same date. These are mandatory requirements. Daubert motions shall be filed on 3/16/2023, with responses due 3/30/2023, and replies by 4/6/2023. The Court will conduct a Daubert Hearing on this matter on 4/12/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 351 before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/19/2022 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is to set up the conference call by joining the other participants and calling the Court at (330) 884-7435. Parties' attendance is welcome, but not mandatory. Counsel should notify the Court in advance of a Status Conference if the matter has settled. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/30/2022. (JLG)
March 30, 2022 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2022. Present were Attorneys Kip T. Bollin and Judd D. Lauter on behalf of Plaintiff; and Attorneys Deborah A. Wilcox and Cory N. Barnes on behalf of Defendant. Also present were Jill Green as representative for Plaintiff and Gary Colister as representative for Defendant. The parties discussed the proposed case management schedule, alternative dispute resolution, and the Daubert motion timeline. The Court is adopting the parties' proposed case management schedule in part. A stipulation regarding inadvertent disclosure must be filed by 4/13/2022. A Telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 12:00 p.m. A Daubert hearing will occur on 4/12/2023 at 9:30 a.m. A separate case management order will issue (Court Reporter: None); Time: 25 Minutes. (JLG)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Stipulation and Order approving the parties' #20 -1 Stipulated Order for the Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/29/2022. (JLG)
March 29, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Bollin, Kip)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Court regrets the circumstances that caused the Motion to Reschedule and regrettably is unable to reschedule the Telephonic Case Management Conference as suggested. The Court will be in trial on the new date suggested. While the Court prefers to engage lead counsel, there are a sufficient number of counsel for Plaintiff that another should be able to accommodate the Telephonic Case Management Conference on 3/30/2022. The Telephonic Case Management Conference will proceed as scheduled. Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/29/2022. (JLG)
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bollin, Kip)
March 24, 2022 Filing 19 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Talis Biomedical Corporation filed by Talis Clinical, LLC. (Barnes, Cory)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #18 Unopposed Motion for Third Extension of Time until 3/24/2022 to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/8/2022. (JLG)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for third extension of time until 3/24/2022 to answer /respond to complaint filed by Defendant Talis Clinical, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Barnes, Cory)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 Attorney Appearance by Cory N Barnes filed by on behalf of Talis Clinical, LLC. (Barnes, Cory)
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 3/30/2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #15 Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time until 3/8/2022 to File Answer/Response to Complaint #1 . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/14/2022. (JLG)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for second extension of time until 3/8/2022 to file answer/response to complaint #1 filed by Talis Clinical, LLC. (Wilcox, Deborah) Modified on 2/7/2022 (D,Ju).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendant's #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 2/9/2022 to File Answer/Response to Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/14/2022. (JLG)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 2/9/2022 to file answer/response to complaint filed by Defendant Talis Clinical, LLC. (Wilcox, Deborah) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (D,Ju).
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Deborah A. Wilcox filed on behalf of All Defendants. (Wilcox, Deborah) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (D,Ju).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order granting #4 , #5 , #6 Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys Colette A. Ghazarian, Judd D. Lauter, and John P. Oleksiuk for Plaintiff Talis Biomedical Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 12/6/2021. (JLG)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colette Ghazarian, filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. Related document(s) #4 . (Bollin, Kip) Modified text description on 11/30/2021 (D,Ju).
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Judd D. Lauter, filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. Related document(s) #5 . (Bollin, Kip) Modified text description on 11/30/2021 (D,Ju).
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Paul Oleksiuk, filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. Related document(s) #6 . (Bollin, Kip) Modified text description on 11/30/2021 (D,Ju).
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. Talis Clinical, LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022 filed on behalf of Talis Biomedical Corporation (Bollin, Kip)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Colon, Jada)
November 22, 2021 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 11/29/2021. (W,Na)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for attorney John Paul Oleksiuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11143025, filed by Plaintiff Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (document does not contain an original signature))(Bollin, Kip) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (M,TL).
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Judd D. Lauter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11143012, filed by Plaintiff Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (document does not contain an original signature))(Bollin, Kip) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (M,TL).
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Colette A. Ghazarian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11142986, filed by Plaintiff Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (document does not contain an original signature))(Bollin, Kip) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (M,TL).
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (O,K)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Bollin, Kip)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Talis Clinical, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11128380.. Filed by Talis Biomedical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bollin, Kip)
November 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K)
November 10, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talis Biomedical Corporation v. Talis Clinical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talis Biomedical Corporation
Represented By: Jada M. Colon
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Represented By: Colette A. Ghazarian
Represented By: John P. Oleksiuk
Represented By: Judd D. Lauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talis Clinical, LLC
Represented By: Cory N Barnes
Represented By: Deborah A. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?