(Junior) et al v. Canton City School District et al
Plaintiff: K.W. (Junior), K.W. (Senior) and L. C.
Defendant: Marcus Wattley, Canton City School District, Canton City School District Board of Education, Jeffery Talbert, Marcus Watley, Frank McLeod, Zachary Sweat, Romeo Harris, Cade Brodie, Tyler Thatcher, Joshua Grimsley and Romero Harris
Case Number: 5:2021cv02423
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 Reply in support of #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Joshua Grimsley. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
February 22, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and, Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Canton City School District, Canton City School District Board of Education, Jeffery Talbert. (Perrico, Kathryn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 Opposition to #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gilbert, Edward)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cade Brodie waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Romero Harris waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Frank McLeod waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Zachary Sweat waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Tyler Thatcher waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Marcus Wattley waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service)(Gilbert, Edward)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Peter G. Pattakos and Joseph Coburn filed by on behalf of Cade Brodie, Romero Harris, Frank McLeod, Zachary Sweat, Tyler Thatcher, Marcus Wattley. (Pattakos, Peter)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Joshua Grimsley. Related document(s) #1 . (Freeze, Bartholomew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Bartholomew T. Freeze and Myrl H. Shoemaker, III, filed by on behalf of Joshua Grimsley. (Freeze, Bartholomew)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Canton City School District waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Canton City School District Board of Education waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022; Jeffery Talbert waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service of Summons (Canton City School District), #2 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service of Summons (Canton City School District Board of Education), #3 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service of Summons (Jeffery Talbert))(Gilbert, Edward)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Kathryn I. Perrico , Sara Ravas Cooper, and Miriam Fair filed by on behalf of Canton City School District, Canton City School District Board of Education, Jeffery Talbert. (Perrico, Kathryn)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons filed. (P,G)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Plaintiffs. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11199585.. Filed by K.W. (Junior). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gilbert, Edward)
December 29, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (P,G)
December 29, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (P,G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (Junior) et al v. Canton City School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Wattley
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton City School District
Represented By: Kathryn I. Perrico
Represented By: Sara Ravas Cooper
Represented By: Maria Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton City School District Board of Education
Represented By: Kathryn I. Perrico
Represented By: Maria Fair
Represented By: Sara Ravas Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Talbert
Represented By: Kathryn I. Perrico
Represented By: Maria Fair
Represented By: Sara Ravas Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Watley
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McLeod
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Sweat
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cade Brodie
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Thatcher
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Grimsley
Represented By: Bartholomew T. Freeze
Represented By: Myrl H. Shoemaker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero Harris
Represented By: Joseph R. Coburn
Represented By: Peter G. Pattakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.W. (Junior)
Represented By: Edward L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.W. (Senior)
Represented By: Edward L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. C.
Represented By: Edward L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?