Heinz v. Folland et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Heinz
Defendant: Attorney Robert Folland, Barnes & Thornburg LLC, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. and Barnes & Thornburg LLP
Case Number: 5:2022cv00576
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Robert Folland. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Docket Report - Foreclosure Action, #3 Exhibit 2 - Heinz Brief in Opposition to Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Judgment Entry in Foreclosure Action, #5 Exhibit 4 - Complaint in Portage County Common Pleas, #6 Exhibit 5 - Complaint in Portage County Common Pleas, #7 Exhibit 6 - Judgment Entry in Portage County Common Pleas, #8 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in Portage County Common Pleas, #9 Exhibit 8 - Confirmation of Sale in Foreclosure Action, #10 Exhibit 9 - Motion for Reconsideration in Appeal, #11 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #12 Exhibit 11 - Judgment Entry denying Motion for Reconsideration, #13 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court of Foreclosure Action, #14 Exhibit 13 - J. Oliver Order of Remand, #15 Exhibit 14 - 6th Circuit Order dismissing Appeal, #16 Exhibit 15 - Complaint against U.S. Bank, #17 Exhibit 16 - Complaint against ERADAL, #18 Exhibit 17 - Complaint in Portage County, #19 Exhibit 18 - Judgment Entry in Portage County Common Pleas, #20 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Appearance in Foreclosure Action, #21 Exhibit 20 - Complaint in Dare v. Nam, #22 Exhibit 21 - Complaint in Jones v. Bengston, #23 Exhibit 22 - Complaint in Bey v. Michael, #24 Exhibit 23 - Complaint in Robinson v. Moynihan, #25 Exhibit 24 - Docket Report in Lindsey v. Heinz, #26 Exhibit 25 - Docket Report in State v. Heinz)(Shelton, Kyle)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 Objection to Order Granting Extension filed by Timothy J. Heinz. Related document #7 . (O,K)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order For good cause shown, Defendants Robert Folland and Barnes & Thornburg LLP's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is granted until 6/20/2022. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/3/2022. (JLG)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 Alias Summons issued to plaintiff at counter for service upon HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. (M,TL)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Timothy J. Heinz. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(M,TL)
May 3, 2022 Copy of #7 Order mailed to Plaintiff Timothy J. Heinz, P.O. Box 1071, Ravenna, OH 44266 on 5/3/2022. Related document(s) #7 . (JLG)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/20/2022 to Answer Move, or Plead in Response to Complaint filed by Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Robert Folland. (Shelton, Kyle)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Kyle A. Shelton and Lisa S. DelGrosso filed by on behalf of Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Robert Folland. (Shelton, Kyle)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to plaintiff at the counter for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (O,K)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Barnes & Thornburg LLC, Robert Folland and HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.. Filing fee paid of $402.00, Receipt # 54660008524. Filed by Timothy J. Heinz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy Heinz, #2 Affidavit of Joseph R. Esquivel Jr., #3 Letter Dated 4/19/2021 with Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A - Note, #5 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit C and D - Corporate Assignment of Mortgage and Notice of Federal Tax Lien, #7 Portage County Foreclosure 2014cv00409, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (O,K)
April 11, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (O,K)
April 11, 2022 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (O,K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinz v. Folland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Heinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Robert Folland
Represented By: Kyle A. Shelton
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Thornburg LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Thornburg LLP
Represented By: Kyle A. Shelton
Represented By: Lisa S. DelGrosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?