Oiler v. Cleavenger et al
Plaintiff: Beth Oiler
Defendant: Todd Cleavenger, Ohio Specialized Investments, LTD. and Fast Lane of Ohio, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv00806
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of receipt of copy of order of remand and docket sheet received on 6/27/2022 from Summit County Court of Common Pleas received. Related document #5 . (O,K)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 Motion To Strike Beth Oiler's Motion For Remand And For An Award Of Costs against Todd Cleavenger filed by Defendant Todd Cleavenger. Envelope return address addressed to Chad Irby Sr., #627826, PO Box 8107, Mansfield, Ohio, 44901. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(K,L)
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Summit County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (P,G)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Cleavenger has not met his burden to establish a basis for original jurisdiction over the State action filed against him, the Court REMANDS this action to the Summit County Court of Common Pleas. (Related document #1 ). Judge John R. Adams on 6/17/2022. (P,G)
June 17, 2022 Copy of #4 Order of Remand, mailed to Todd Cleavenger #A763-634, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 6/17/2022. (P,G)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to Remand to State Court and Motion for an Award of Costs Against Defendant Todd Cleavenger filed by Plaintiff Beth Oiler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A - Journal Entry of August 6, 2019, #3 Exhibit B - Decision and Journal Entry of March 9, 2022, #4 Exhibit C - Summit County Common Pleas Court Docket, #5 Exhibit D - Order of August 23, 2021)(Bach, Lawrence). Modified text on 6/10/2022 (M,TL).
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Affidavit of Prisoner) filed by Defendant Todd Cleavenger. (Attachments: #1 Request for Certified Account Statement)(M,TL)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-2020-12-3655 with jury demand. Filing fee not paid, IFP, filed by Todd Cleavenger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 & 2 - Praecipe & Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #5 Envelope) (M,TL)
May 18, 2022 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oiler v. Cleavenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Oiler
Represented By: Lawrence R. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Cleavenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Specialized Investments, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Lane of Ohio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?